Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Davachi et al
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Defendant: Reza Davachi, Bahareh Davachi, Gayle Barnes, DirectDeals, LLC and G.W.J. Sourcenet Distribution, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv03575
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge 12/20/2011 on 12/20/2011. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER for Davachi Defendants. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/29/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 43 Motion Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE ATTENDANCE: Adobe to produce representative at mediation with full settlement authority AND that Scott Bain and/or other representantion from SHA shall only have limited participation at mediation; Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/11/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING 32 MAY 18, 2011 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER 32 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 7/1/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the ADR deadline to August 17, 2011. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/18/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/4/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 11/19/10 is continued to 2/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/3/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Davachi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reza Davachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bahareh Davachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DirectDeals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.W.J. Sourcenet Distribution, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?