Tuttle et al v. Sky Bell Asset Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edgar W. Tuttle, Eric Braun, The Braun Family Trust and Wendy Meg Siegel
Defendant: Sky Bell Asset Management LLC, Gary R. Marks, Geoffrey M. Gotsch, Michael Sell, Agile Sky Alliance Fund, LP, Agile Sky Alliance Fund GP, LLC, Agile Group LLC, Greenberg & Associates, Inc., Neal Greenberg, Eden Rock Finance Fund, LP, Solid Rock Management Limited, ERCM LLP, Santo Volpe, Ernst & Young LLP, Night Watch Partners, LP, Sky Bell Offshore Partners, LTD, Pipeline Investors, LP, Sky Bell Select, LP, Wailea Partners, LP, Wailea Capital GP, LLC, Wailea Advisors, LP, Prospect Capital, LLC, William Belhumeur, Rothstein Kass & Company, P.C. and McGladrey & Pullen, LLP
Case Number: 3:2010cv03588
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS AND COMPLETION OF WORK (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE. Responses due by 01/07/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER RE STATUS. Responses due by noon on 10/31/12. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; ATTORNEYS FEES (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NOTICE re 385 Fairness Hearing, Motion Hearing,,. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 9, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 384 FIFTH ORDER RE UNDELIVERABLE CLASS NOTICES. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 8, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER RE REQUESTS TO OPT OUT/OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 23, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 379 FOURTH ORDER RE UNDELIVERABLE CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 13, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 373 THIRD ORDER RE UNDELIVERABLE CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 26, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 SECOND ORDER RE UNDELIVERABLE CLASS NOTICES. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 20, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER RE UNDELIVERABLE CLASS NOTICES. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER VACATING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 1, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION REGARDING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on APril 20, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE REGARDING ISSUES TO BE ADDRESSED AT HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT re 343 Order on Stipulation, 340 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Wendy Meg Siegel, The Braun Family Trust, Eric Braun, Edgar W. Tuttle. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 16, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO DISSEMINATE CLASS NOTICE re 334 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Wendy Meg Siegel, The Braun Family Trust, Eric Braun, Edgar W. Tuttle. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 23, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM DEADLINE TO DISSEMINATE CLASS NOTICE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE PARTIES' MEDIATED SETTLEMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 331 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 330 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (6/18/2012) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (6/4/2012). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/14/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE re 322 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Wendy Meg Siegel, The Braun Family Trust, Eric Braun, Edgar W. Tuttle. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 29, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 307 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE CONFIRMING FEBRUARY 9, 2012 HEARING DATE re 309 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 6, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE REGARDING HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 9, 2012. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 2, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER TO ACCELERATE TIME FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES re 296 Stipulation, filed by Wendy Meg Siegel, The Braun Family Trust, Eric Braun, Edgar W. Tuttle Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 23, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES by Hon. William Alsup granting 292 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 289 Stipulation filed by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 19, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 18, 2011 re 275 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Wendy Meg Siegel, The Braun Family Trust, Eric Braun, Edgar W. Tuttle. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 22, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 60(b)(1) by Judge Alsup denying 267 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 270 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARTION OF JOEL M. WOLOSKY by Hon. William Alsup granting 260 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 207 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION TO BE PROVIDED AT CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING re 207 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Wendy Meg Siegel, The Braun Family Trust, Eric Braun, Edgar W. Tuttle (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION FROM COUNSEL re 207 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Wendy Meg Siegel, The Braun Family Trust, Eric Braun, Edgar W. Tuttle (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 AMENDED ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF VENUE re 229 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER GRANTING FUND DEFENDANTS' AND EDEN ROCK DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF VENUE 75 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Memoranda of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Wailea Capital GP, LLC, Sky Bell Offshore Partners, LTD, Sky Bell Asset Management LLC, Pipeline Investors, LP, Wailea Partners, LP, Gary R. Marks, Geoffrey M. Gotsch, Michael Sell, Night Watch Partners, LP, Wailea Advisors, LP, Sky Bell Select, LP, McGladrey & Pu llen, LLP, Rothstein Kass & Company, P.C., Agile Sky Alliance Fund GP, LLC, Agile Group LLC, 73 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by ERCM LLP, Solid Rock Management Limited, Eden Rock Finance Fund, LP. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 9, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER REGARDING LETTER FROM AUDITOR DEFENDANTS DATED AUGUST 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 30, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 REQUEST FOR STATEMENT FROM PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL REGARDING CITATIONS IN BRIEFING REGARDING ERNST & YOUNG LLC. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 29, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 REMINDER THAT DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION REMAINS AUGUST 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 17, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING EX PARTE UNDER SEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO LATER PUBLIC DISCLOSURE by Hon. William Alsup granting 195 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 12, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup denying 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney..(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re Letters filed by Rothstein Kass & Company]. Response due by noon on 8/9/2011. Meet-and-confer on 8/12/2011 starting at 9:00 A.M. AND CONTINUING THROUGH TO 1:30 PM in Court's jury room. Please buzz chambers at 9:00 AM to be let into the jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 8/12/2011 before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 4, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 170 Letter filed by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP]. Response due by noon on 8/5/2011. Meet-and-confer on 8/12/2011 starting at 9:00 A.M. AND CONTINUING THROUGH TO 1:30 PM in Court's j ury room. Please buzz chambers at 9:00 AM to be let into the jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 8/12/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/3/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO VACATE AUGUST 11 DEADLINE AFTER JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AS TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 1, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 23, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER DENYING AUDITOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE ERNST & YOUNG'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup denying 128 Motion to Dismiss; deferring ruling on 136 Motion to Dismiss (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER HOLDING IN ABEYANCE AUDITOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND E&Y'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING E&Y'S PRECIS, Motions terminated: 150 MOTION for Leave to File to Expand Grounds of its Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Ernst & Young LLC. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 8, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR HEARING ON CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 26, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ERNST & YOUNG LLC LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS AND SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 125 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND HOLDING IN ABEYANCE IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 11, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING FUND DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO REPLACE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Alsup granting 112 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO SEEK LEAVE TO ADD NEW PARTIES by Judge Alsup granting 105 Motion to Continue (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (whalc2, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF STEVEN FEDER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE AND FOR EXTENSION TO OPPOSE ER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup granting 92 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS THROUGH COUNSEL FOR THE GREENBERG DEFENDANTS by Judge Alsup granting 70 Ex Parte Application (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND DENYING RENEWED MOTION TO REMAND by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Alsup denying 26 Motion to Remand (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 36 Stipulation filed by McGladrey & Pullen, LLP]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/12/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF KATHERINE M. TURNER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuttle et al v. Sky Bell Asset Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar W. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Braun Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Meg Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Bell Asset Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey M. Gotsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agile Sky Alliance Fund, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agile Sky Alliance Fund GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agile Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenberg & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eden Rock Finance Fund, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solid Rock Management Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERCM LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santo Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernst & Young LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Night Watch Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Bell Offshore Partners, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipeline Investors, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Bell Select, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wailea Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wailea Capital GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wailea Advisors, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Belhumeur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rothstein Kass & Company, P.C.
Represented By: Maxwell Michael Blecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGladrey & Pullen, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?