Greer v. Electronic Arts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Greer
Defendant: Frank Klepacki, Electronic Arts, Inc. and Virgin Interactive Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03601
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 155 FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY, FOR FURTHER DEPOSITIONS, AND FOR SANCTIONS re 151 Letter Brief, filed by Gregory A. Greer. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 10, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND RE-OPEN DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 14, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S NOVEMBER 6, 2012 MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 2/11/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/11/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 121 EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/7/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2012 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2012 10:00 AM ; Jury Selection set for 9/24/2012 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 9/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/22/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL IN PART (Dkt. No. 105). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/16/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 74 Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTARY MATERIAL AND DENYING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR HEARING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/15/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AND REFERRING MOTION TO COMPEL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/18/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOR SECOND CONTINUANCE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE 52 GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/9/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/4/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: 16 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/6/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2011 10:00 AM. Responsive pleading and consent or declination due by 12/20/10.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/24/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting 10 Motion to Continue AS MODIFIED (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Electronic Arts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory A. Greer
Represented By: Steven Charles Posner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Klepacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Interactive Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?