Implicit Networks, Inc v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Implicit Networks, Inc
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03606
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting substitution (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER extending deadline re: invalidity contentions re 49 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2011 02:30 PM. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR ADR (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER extending deadline for ADR (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Implicit Networks, Inc v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Implicit Networks, Inc
Represented By: George F. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?