Nelson v. ev3, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Randall King Nelson
Defendant: ev3, Inc., FoxHollow Technologies, Inc., Covidien, plc, Covidien Group S.A.R.L. and COV Delaware Corp.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03668
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Alsup granting 60 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2011 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 10, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT by Judge Alsup denying 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE by Judge Alsup granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO AMEND HIS COMPLAINT AND TERMINATING EFFORTS TO FASHION HYBRID REPRESENTATIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 2, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REGARDING DISPUTES PRECEDING SHAREHOLDER NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 24, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REGARDING FURTHER CHANGES TO STIPULATED FORM OF SHAREHOLDER NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 19, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED APPORTIONMENT LANGUAGE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 16, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATED FORM OF SHAREHOLDER NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 10, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT PROPOSED FORM OF SHAREHOLDER NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT NOTICE BE PROVIDED; ORDER FOR TRIAL TO DETERMINE STANDING; AND ORDER GRANTING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF JEFFREY BOUSLOG by Judge Alsup granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. ev3, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall King Nelson
Represented By: Kenneth Alexander Kuwayti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ev3, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey John Bouslog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FoxHollow Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey John Bouslog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien, plc
Represented By: Jeffrey John Bouslog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien Group S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Jeffrey John Bouslog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COV Delaware Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey John Bouslog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?