National Union of Healthcare Workers et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Estrada, Angela Glasper, National Union of Healthcare Workers, Lisa Engles, David Mallon, Turusew Wilson, Robert Hernandez, Robin Blake, George Wong and Sonia Askew
Defendant: Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. and Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Not Classified By Court: SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West ("UHW-W")
Case Number: 3:2010cv03686
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING #120 STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014).
March 13, 2014 Filing 120 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RE DEADLINE FOR FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/12/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014).
February 27, 2014 Filing 118 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Matter settled. Parties anticipate finalizing written settlement agreement and dismissing case by March 10, 2014. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RESCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/21/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Settlement Conference set for 3/4/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/19/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying #95 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 114 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2014 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/29/2014) re #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. Motion taken under submission. (Court Reporter Julie Ralston.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 113 Request for Judicial Notice re #112 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #112 ) (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 112 REPLY (re #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Porcha Lombard, #2 Declaration of Valerie Boddie)(Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 111 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 14, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Roche Krasilnikoff (Krasilnikoff, Jean) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 109 Proposed Order re #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Plaintiff's Proposed Order Denying MSJ by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 108 DECLARATION of Sophia Sims in Opposition to #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Related document(s) #95 ) (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Isaiah Arvizu in Opposition to #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Related document(s) #95 ) (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 106 DECLARATION of Alice Scott in Opposition to #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Related document(s) #95 ) (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Phyllis Willett in Opposition to #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs 1-3 of Willett Decl)(Related document(s) #95 ) (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 104 DECLARATION of Benjamin Siegel in Opposition to #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 1-2a of B. Siegel Decl, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2b of B. Siegel Decl, #3 Exhibit Exs. 2c - Ex. 4 of B. Siegel Decl, #4 Exhibit Exs. 5-10 of B. Siegel Decl, #5 Exhibit Ex. 11a of B. Siegel Decl, #6 Exhibit Exs. 11b - 14 of B. Siegel Decl)(Related document(s) #95 ) (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 103 DECLARATION of Latika Malkani In Opposition re #95 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 1-4 to Malkani Decl.)(Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014) Modified on 1/6/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2014 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Jean Roche Krasilnikoff in Opposition to #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs. 1-7 to J. Krasilnikoff Decl., #2 Exhibit Exs. 8-11 to J. Krasilnikoff Decl., #3 Exhibit Exs. 12-16 to J. Krasilnikoff Decl., #4 Exhibit Exs. 17-21 to J. Krasilnikoff Decl., #5 Exhibit Exs. 22-26 to J. Krasilnikoff Decl., #6 Exhibit Exs. 27-35 to J. Krasilnikoff Decl.)(Related document(s) #95 ) (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Ralph Cornejo In Opposition re #95 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Cornejo Decl.)(Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014) Modified on 1/6/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2014 Filing 100 Request for Judicial Notice re #99 Opposition filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F to Ps' RFJN)(Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014) Modified on 1/6/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2014 Filing 99 RESPONSE (re #95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/6/2014) Modified on 1/6/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER VACATING DATES FOR TRIAL, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, AND JANUARY 9 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/13/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 97 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 12/11/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/11/2013). Jury Selection set for 3/31/2014 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #98 Order Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 3/31/2014 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 96 Letter from Bruce A. Harland in Response to Order Setting Hearing on Plaintiffs' Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Harland, Bruce) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/19/2013. Replies due by 12/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Declaration Declaration of MIchael P. Curtis, #6 Exhibits A through D to Declaration of Michael P. Curtis, #7 Exhibits E through H to Declaration of Michael P. Curtis, #8 Declaration Declaration of Henry Diaz, #9 Exhibit A to Declaration of Henry Diaz, #10 Exhibit B to Declaration of Henry Diaz, #11 Exhibit C to Declaration of Henry Diaz (Part 1 of 4), #12 Exhibit C to Declaration of Henry Diaz (Part 2 of 4), #13 Exhibit C to Declaration of Henry Diaz (Part 3 of 4), #14 Exhibit C to Declaration of Henry Diaz (Part 4 of 4), #15 Declaration of P. Lombard, #16 Declaration of E. Cordova, #17 Declaration of T. Scannell, #18 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #93 Letter filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers]. Response due by noon on 12/9/2013. Two-Hour Meet-and-Confer from 9:30 AM--11:30 AM 12/11/2013 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 12/11/2013 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/5/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 93 Letter from B. Siegel to Judge Alsup . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 92 Letter from Michael P. Curtis, Counsel for Defendants and Counter-Claimants . (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 91 Letter from Michael P. Curtis, Attorney for Defendants and Counter-Claimants Re Discovery Relief. (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 90 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Matter did not settle. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting #86 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RESCHEDULING THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference previously set on 11/18/2013 10:00 AM rescheduled to 11/19/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/28/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS ASKEW, BLAKE, HERNANDEZ, MALLON & WILSON FROM LAWSUIT] filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 24, 2013 Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER] filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting #83 Stipulation.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 7, 2013 Filing 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Discovery Cutoff Date filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Malkani, Latika) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #81 Stipulation to Continue the Settlement Conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #82 Order on Stipulation Settlement Conference continued to 11/18/2013 10:00 AM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #79 Order Setting Settlement Conference JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 80 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/10/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 77 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 6, 2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2013. (Related documents(s) #71 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 76 COUNTERCLAIM against National Union of Healthcare Workers. Filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Southern California Permanente Medical Group. (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 75 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.. (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 74 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byThe Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 73 ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySouthern California Permanente Medical Group. (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 72 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byKaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 19, 2013 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Union of Healthcare Workers for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 70 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 13, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 10/31/2013. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2014 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 12/5/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/12/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [granting #60 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiffs is required to E-FILE the amended document]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #69 Case Management Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Jury Selection set for 2/3/2014 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 67 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 6/6/2013) re #60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 66 Supplemental Brief in Support of #60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/4/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Filing 65 Supplemental Brief re Mootness and Recent Decisions #64 Order, filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/4/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING BY NOON ON 6/4/2013 [re #60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/30/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 63 Request for Judicial Notice re #60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, , #62 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint)(Related document(s) #60 , #62 ) (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/20/2013) Modified on 5/21/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2013 Filing 62 REPLY (re #60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, ) filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/20/2013) Modified on 5/21/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 61 RESPONSE (re #60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, ) Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A through C to Request for Judicial Notice)(Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 60 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/13/2013. Replies due by 5/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plaintiff's [PROPOSED] Amended Complaint, #2 Appendix REDLINED Plaintiff's [PROPOSED] Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Plaintiff's [PROPOSED] Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint)(Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting #44 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 58 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 3/28/2013) re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 57 RESPONSE (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Plt's Supplemental Brief re Primary Jurisdiction in Opposition to Def's Motion to Dismiss filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 22, 2013 Filing 56 Supplemental Brief re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #44 ) (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING by noon on 3/22/2013. Motion Hearing reset for 3/28/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/19/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 11, 2013 Filing 54 Supplemental RESPONSE (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) > filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/11/2013) Modified on 3/11/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2013 Filing 53 Supplemental Brief re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #44 ) (Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (by noon on 3/11/2013). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/8/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 51 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motion to Dismiss set for 3/21/2013 8:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 50 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 28, 2013 Filing 49 REPLY (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Lindsay, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 14, 2013 Filing 48 EXHIBITS re #46 Proposed Order, #47 Request for Judicial Notice, #45 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3), #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #46 , #47 , #45 ) (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 14, 2013 Filing 47 Request for Judicial Notice re #46 Proposed Order, #45 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3))(Related document(s) #46 , #45 ) (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 14, 2013 Filing 46 Proposed Order re #45 Opposition/Response to Motion, by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 14, 2013 Filing 45 RESPONSE (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) [MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION] filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's' Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 2/14/2013. Replies due by 2/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1 of 4, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2 of 4, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 3 of 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 4 of 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Curtis, Michael) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 17, 2013 Filing 43 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/17/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/17/2013). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motion to dismiss due by 1/31/2013. Reply due by 2/28/2013. Opposition due by 2/14/2013. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/17/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Malkani, Latika) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 4, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #40 Order Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 3, 2013 Filing 39 STIPULATION re #38 Order Joint Report for Case Management Conference and Stipulation re Lifting of Stay of Action filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Anderson, Alicia) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #37 Stipulation filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 6, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 5, 2012 Filing 37 STIPULATION , Joint, to Continue Case Management Conference for at Least 30 Days filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re #35 Stipulation filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers]. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/2/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 28, 2012 Filing 35 STIPULATION [JOINT] TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR AT LEAST 90 DAYS filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/10/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 33 STIPULATION [JOINT] TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR AT LEAST 90 DAYS filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re #31 Stipulation filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers]. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/29/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 31 STIPULATION [JOINT] TO CONTINUE CMC FOR AT LEAST 90 DAYS filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
December 8, 2011 Filing 30 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/8/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/8/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2012 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/8/2011)
December 8, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings:, ***Deadlines terminated. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: This case remains STAYED until next case management conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/8/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Lindsay, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2011 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 25, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 26 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sonia Askew. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
March 2, 2011 Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
November 23, 2010 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 11/29/10 has been taken off calendar and will be rescheduled at a later date. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER STAYING ACTION, DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS, AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup denying #9 Motion to Dismiss (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 24 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/18/2010) re #9 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 22 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/29/10 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 605-477-3000 and use access code 560060. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Malkani, Latika) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Malkani, Latika) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 19 Reply to Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition to Stay of Proceeding filed byNational Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 17 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/28/2010) re #9 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 16 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Their #9 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 10/21/2010) Modified on 10/22/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2010 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Their Reply Brief on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit A-2 Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' #9 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by National Union of Healthcare Workers. (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/7/2010) Modified on 10/8/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 12 Proposed Order re #11 Certificate of Interested Entities, #10 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Lindsay, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Lindsay, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Lindsay, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lindsay, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Union of Healthcare Workers re Defendant The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. re #1 COMPLAINT, #2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER, #3 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER,(Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Union of Healthcare Workers re Defendant Southern California Permanente Medical Group re #1 COMPLAINT, #2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER, #3 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER, (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Union of Healthcare Workers re Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals re #1 COMPLAINT, #2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER, #3 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER,(Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Union of Healthcare Workers as to Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #1 COMPLAINT , #2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER, #3 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER, (Siegel, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #2 ADR Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/2008. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611005578, summons issued). Filed by Robert Hernandez, Turusew Wilson, Angela Glasper, Robin Blake, Danielle Estrada, National Union of Healthcare Workers, George Wong, Lisa Engles, David Mallon, Sonia Askew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union of Healthcare Workers et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Permanente Medical Group
Represented By: Alicia Cabeceira Anderson
Represented By: Christopher David Baker
Represented By: Michael Paul Curtis
Represented By: Michael Rao Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Cabeceira Anderson
Represented By: Christopher David Baker
Represented By: Michael Paul Curtis
Represented By: Michael Rao Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Cabeceira Anderson
Represented By: Christopher David Baker
Represented By: Michael Paul Curtis
Represented By: Michael Rao Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Alicia Cabeceira Anderson
Represented By: Christopher David Baker
Represented By: Michael Paul Curtis
Represented By: Michael Rao Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Estrada
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Glasper
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union of Healthcare Workers
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Engles
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mallon
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turusew Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hernandez
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Blake
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Wong
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Jean Roche Krasilnikoff
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Askew
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Represented By: Latika Moti Malkani
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SEIU United Healthcare Workers-West ("UHW-W")
Represented By: Bruce A. Harland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?