Landmark American Insurance Company v. Angotti & Reilly, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Landmark American Insurance Company
Defendant: Angotti & Reilly, Inc., Alexander Group LLC, Blue River Seafood Inc. and Christopher H. Lam
Case Number: 3:2010cv03687
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/5/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER VACATING DEADLINES PENDING DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/10/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER - Status Report due by 7/12/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SECOND ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE STATEMENT RE: RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/7/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY THE ACTION AND VACATING HEARING, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying 31 Motion to Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM re 33 Stipulation filed by Angotti & Reilly, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 17, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark American Insurance Company v. Angotti & Reilly, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: William Luther Marchant
Represented By: Denis Francis Shanagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angotti & Reilly, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue River Seafood Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher H. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?