Rambus Inc. v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: Rambus Inc.
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv03736
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 73 Stipulation of Dismissal.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 Stipulation re: Case Schedule. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING 65 Stipulation Re: Case Schedule: Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/15/2011 01:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/1/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING (47 in 3:10-cv-04017-JSW) and (63 in 3:10-cv-03736-JSW) Stipulation Re: Case Schedule: Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/18/2011 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/4/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/31/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE CASE SCHEDULE re 61 . Tutorial Hearing set for 9/21/2011 01:30 PM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/5/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/12/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 59 Stipulation Re: Case Schedule. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/21/2011 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 9/7/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/11/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING (47 in 3:10-cv-03736-JSW) Stipulation for Order Rescheduling Case Management Conference., (26 in 3:10-cv-04017-JSW) Stipulation for Order Rescheduling Case Management Conference: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/24/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/1/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 16 Motion to Transfer Case (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/21/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/14/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rambus Inc. v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rambus Inc.
Represented By: Srikala P. Atluri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?