Sanderson v. Swift Transportation Co., Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michael Sanderson
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co., Inc and Interstate Equipment Leasing, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv03739
Filed: August 23, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference Scheduled for December 14, 2011. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 12/12/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 16, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing Scheduled for November 23, 2011 52 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/16/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
September 14, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Request for Telephonic Appearance re 44 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/13/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
August 29, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 9/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco re 42 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/26/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
November 2, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL re 35 Proposed Order, filed by Interstate Equipment Leasing, Inc, Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, LLC. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/2/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 19, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A SURREPLY re 31 Proposed Order filed by Michael Sanders. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/19/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderson v. Swift Transportation Co., Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sanderson
Represented By: Randall Charles Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co., Inc
Represented By: Ellen Marie Bronchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Equipment Leasing, Inc
Represented By: Ellen Marie Bronchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?