Digital Chocolate, Inc v. Zynga Game Network, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Digital Chocolate, Inc
Defendant: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03758
Filed: August 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2011 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice by Digital Chocolate, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CORRECTIVE NOTICE RE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [re 24 Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Case Referred to Private ADR]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/5/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
November 19, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Thomas Norberg (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to private mediator. Private mediator must be on board by 12/31/2010 and the mediation completed by 1/31/2011. Discovery due by 8/19/2011. Jury Trial set for 11/7/2011 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 9/22/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/18/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/18/2010), Case referred to Private ADR. Jury Selection set for 11/7/2011 07:30AM. Jury Trial set for 11/7/2011 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 23 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Digital Chocolate, Inc (Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 22 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 23 . *** STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Digital Chocolate, Inc (Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 11/16/2010) Modified on 11/17/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2010 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Game Network, Inc. re 20 Answer to Complaint (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byZynga Game Network, Inc.. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Digital Chocolate, Inc. (Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zynga Game Network, Inc. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Zynga Game Network Inc. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 15 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2010 11:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/18/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 10 Second Stipulation Extending Time by Which Defendant Zynga Game Network Inc. Must Respond to the Complaint by Zynga Game Network, Inc. (Wilson, Dennis) (Filed on 10/7/2010) Modified on 10/8/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/15/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time By Which Defendant Zynga Game Network Inc. Must Respond To The Complaint re ( 1 ) by Digital Chocolate, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/16/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2010 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Digital Chocolate, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2010 Filing 6 Proof of Service as to defendant Zynga Game Network, Inc. served on 8/25/2010, answer due 9/15/2010 by Digital Chocolate, Inc (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010, incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 24, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2010: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Zynga Game Network, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Parties by Digital Chocolate, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Seeking Damages and Injunctive Relief (Summons Issued); jury demand; OVERSIZED DOCUMENT against Zynga Game Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611049715). Filed by Digital Chocolate, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to Complaint) (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/31/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 5 Exhibit E to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit F to Complaint, # 7 Exhibit G to Complaint, # 8 Exhibit H to Complaint, # 9 Exhibit I to Complaint) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 10 Exhibit J to Complaint, # 11 Exhibit K to Complaint, # 12 Exhibit L to Complaint, # 13 Exhibit M to Complaint, # 14 Exhibit N to Complaint) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 15 Exhibit O to Complaint, # 16 Exhibit Q to Complaint, # 17 Exhibit R to Complaint, # 18 Exhibit S to Complaint, # 19 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Chocolate, Inc v. Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Chocolate, Inc
Represented By: Susan Denise Berney-Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis LeRoy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?