Hasbrouck v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Plaintiff: Edward Hasbrouck
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 3:2010cv03793
Filed: August 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 57 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 MODIFIED BREIFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/24/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 11:45 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/2/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: 9 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/15/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hasbrouck v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hasbrouck
Represented By: David A Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?