Litmon v. Brown

Plaintiff: David Litmon, Jr.
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Case Number: 3:2010cv03894
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 53 Stipulation filed by Edmund G. Brown, Kamala D. Harris. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/26/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 14, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Court to Rescind Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
September 12, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 38 Defedants' Motion to Strike and Dismiss First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
June 8, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 25, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 34 Request filed by David Litmon, Jr.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/25/11. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
April 29, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING ASIDE JUDGMENT AND REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 15, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
March 21, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 15, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED/CORRECTED ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 14, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Litmon v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Litmon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?