Cobb et al v. Brede et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan D. Cobb, Sr. and Walter Arlen St. Clair
Defendant: Ernest Brede, Luis Contreras, Paul Koehler, Larry Laverdure, Donald Showers, Aaron Lucas and Steve Misterfeld
Case Number: 3:2010cv03907
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 138 Motion for Reconsideration (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/3/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/6/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 124 Request filed by Jonathan D. Cobb, Sr., Walter Arlen St. Clair. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/9/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/7/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment By Defendants filed by Richard Ashe, Ernest Brede, Paul Koehler, Donald Showers, Steve Misterfeld, Larry Laverdure, Alan Shuster, Luis Contreras, Aaron Lucas. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/4/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Minute Entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/21/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re 100 Objection filed by Jonathan D. Cobb, Sr., Walter Arlen St. Clair. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/12/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting Request to Extend Discovery Deadline to Complete Deposition of Jason Cobb re 95 Declaration in Support filed by Ernest Brede. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/5/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re 90 Declaration in Support filed by Ernest Brede. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/4/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER COMPELLING JASON COBB'S APPEARANCE FOR DEPOSITION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/29/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/1/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FURTHER DISCOVERY ORDER Status Conference set for 9/1/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/28/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DISCOVERY ORDER. Status Conference set for 7/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/30/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Discovery Meet and Confer set for 6/24/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Status Conference set for 6/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/9/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/9/2011 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/19/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM ADR PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/17/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING OBJECTIONS re 34 Objection filed by Jonathan D. Cobb, Sr., Walter Arlen St. Clair. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/15/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (cdnS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/2/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND ORDER Directing Walter Arlen St. Clair to file consent/declination. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/10/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/4/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb et al v. Brede et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan D. Cobb, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Arlen St. Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Brede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Laverdure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Showers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Misterfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?