Deman v. Allied Administrators, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Russell L. Deman
Defendant: Allied Administrators, Inc, Northern California Tile Industry Trust Funds, Sharon Turner and Linda Martinez
Case Number: 3:2010cv04109
Filed: September 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti GRANTING 27 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, and DENYING Motion for Attorney Fees; DENYING AS MOOT 32 MOTION to Strike, 37 Ex Parte Application to Vacate Jury Trial, and 39 Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Date (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/17/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY, Motions terminated: 24 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and/or His Counsel filed by Allied Administrators, Inc, Northern California Tile Industry Trust Funds, Sharon Turner, Linda Martinez.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/29/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/18/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 5 Motion to Dismiss. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/3/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/15/2010. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Declaration. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/2/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deman v. Allied Administrators, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell L. Deman
Represented By: Daniel Lewis Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Administrators, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern California Tile Industry Trust Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Turner
Represented By: Alexander A. Graft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Martinez
Represented By: Alexander A. Graft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?