Carrington v. Lattimore

Petitioner: Celeste Simone Carrington
Respondent: Mary Lattimore
Case Number: 3:2010cv04179
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/4/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING EQUITABLE TOLLING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND STAY OF EXECUTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/20/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrington v. Lattimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Celeste Simone Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mary Lattimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?