J & J Productions, Inc. v. Martinez
Plaintiff: J & J Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Juana Jimenez Martinez
Case Number: 3:2010cv04202
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST UNSERVED DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than April 29, 2011, why plaintiff's claims against defend ants Raul Jimenez Martinez, Benito Jimenez Martinez, and Gustavo Jimenez Martinez should not be dismissed for failure to serve within the time required by Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 12, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S THIRD EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from April 8, 2011 to May 13, 2011. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 4, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 18, 2011 to April 8, 2011. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 14, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 7, 2011 to February 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 3, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Productions, Inc. v. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juana Jimenez Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?