Implicit Networks, Inc. v. Juniper Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Implicit Networks, Inc.
Defendant: Juniper Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04234
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER ON STIPULATIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL 210 224 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that that Juniper will be deemed to have timely filed any request for costs and/or fees in this action that is submitted on or before April 8, 2013.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/26/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 JUDGMENT: Entered in favor of defendant Juniper Networks, Inc. and against plaintiff Implicit Networks, Inc. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER RE PARTIES' APPLICATIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION OF JUNIPER'S 179 180 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER RE: PARTIES' STIPULATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 165 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER ON IMPLICIT'S MOTION TO COMPEL 152 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER ON JUNIPER'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND IMPLICIT'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 158 159 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER RE IMPLICIT'S SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL FINANCIAL INFORMATION 136 141 143 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RE IMPLICIT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AND A DEPOSITION WITNESS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed on 7/20/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting 108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE IMPLICIT'S MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES 109 111 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER RE JUNIPER'S MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION 100 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION TO STAY 80 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME AND CROSS MOTION TO COMPEL 90 91 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS 81 85 86 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING IN PART JUNIPER'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER AMENDED PATENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND CLAIM CHARTS (SIGNED) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE: LEAVE TO AMEND PATENT LOCAL RULE 3-3 DISCLOSURES 74 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Leave to Serve Amended Disclosures. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/12/2011. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING PATENT LOCAL RULE 2-2 INTERIM MODEL PROTECTIVE ORDER by Juniper (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR ADR (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Implicit Networks, Inc. v. Juniper Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Implicit Networks, Inc.
Represented By: George F. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?