SPECS USA Corp. v. SPECS Surface Nano Analysis GmbH et al
Plaintiff: SPECS USA Corp.
Defendant: SPECS Surface Nano Analysis GmbH and SPECS Surface Nano Analysis, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04250
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION 157 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/1/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying as moot 109 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying as moot 112 Motion for Summary Judgment in light of Settlement Hearing; Setting Compliance Hearing. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 134 Administrative Motion to Correct Clerical Error and Awarding Additional Sanctions. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 145 Letter filed by SPECS Surface Nano Analysis, Inc., SPECS Surface Nano Analysis GmbH for short continuance of the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/3/12(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Awarding Discovery Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/30/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS on 10/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER Dispostive Motions heard by 11/20/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing re withdrawal of claims set for 10/26/12 at 9:01am. Joint Pretrial Statement filed by 3/15/13. Pretrial Conference set 3/29/13 at 9:00am. 5 Day Jury Trial set 4/15/13 at 8:30am. Compliance Hearing set for 3/8/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/4/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 83 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/27/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER; VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Discovery due by 9/14/2012. Motions due by 11/12/2012. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on June 20, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Setting Discovery Hearing for 6/14/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/17/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 64 Plaintiffs' motion for protective order filed by SPECS Surface Nano Analysis, Inc., SPECS Surface Nano Analysis GmbH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/3/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on Joint Discovery Letter. Telephonic Motion Hearing specially set for 5/3/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/23/2012. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 61 Order on Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Deadline for Submission of Joint Letter Brief re Discovery Issues filed by SPECS Surface Nano Analysis, Inc., SPECS Surface Nano Analysis GmbH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/16/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Joint Pretrial statement due by 4/27/2012. Pretrial Conference reset for 5/7/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on 4/9/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012) Modified on 4/9/2012 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Setting Joint Letter Deadline. Joint Discovery Letter due by 4/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/3/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONSOLIDATING CASES Amended Consolidated Complaint due by 8/5/2011. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 23, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER rescheduling December 2 hearing to December 23, 2010 and requesting supplemental briefing. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPECS USA Corp. v. SPECS Surface Nano Analysis GmbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPECS USA Corp.
Represented By: Brendan F. Macaulay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECS Surface Nano Analysis GmbH
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECS Surface Nano Analysis, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?