Twin Star Ventures, Inc et al v. Universal Underwriters Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Twin Star Ventures, Inc, James Earl Cameron and Joshua Scott Cameron
Defendant: Universal Underwriters Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv04284
Filed: September 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of this cause, it is ordered that plaintiffs' claims alleged against defendant be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 25, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFERRED PORTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. To the extent the motion seeks a finding that the duty to defend ceased prior to the conclusion of the Underlying Action, th e motion is denied. To the extent the motion seeks a finding that Universal Underwriters does not have a contractual duty to indemnify Twin Star for the settlement, the motion is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 18, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AFFORDING DEFENDANT OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SUPPLEMENT TO REPLY; VACATING HEARING. To the extent the motion seeks a finding that Universal Underwriters did not have a duty to defend, the motion is denied. To the extent the motion seeks a finding that the duty to defend ceased and a finding that Universal Underwriters is not liable for amounts paid to settle, the Court defers ruling thereon and affords Universal Underwriters leave to file, no later than March 5, 2014, a supplemental reply. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 25, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 THIRD AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/15/2013. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Discovery Order re: 73 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Documents Withheld by Plaintiffs filed by Universal Underwriters Insurance Company.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/8/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. The parties are directed to appear on July 12, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. for a Status Conference. Further, the parties are directed to file, no later than July 5, 2013, a Joint Status Conference Report. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 21, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCLOSURE AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES. The deadline to designate experts is extended to June 3, 2013. The deadline to designate rebuttal experts is extended to June 24, 2013. The deadline to complete expert discovery is extended to July 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 1, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCLOSURE, MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES. The mediation completion date is extended to April 22, 2013. The non-expert discovery cut-off is extended to March 22, 2013. The deadline for designa tion of experts is extended to May 3, 2013. The deadline to designate rebuttal experts is May 24, 2013. The expert discovery cut-off is extended to June 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 65 SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/14/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013) Modified on 1/14/2013 (tlS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES LEAVE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. The parties are granted leave to appear telephonically at the Status Conference on January 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 9, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES AND CONTINUE THE TRIAL. The non-expert discovery cut-off is continued to January 25, 2013. The deadline to designate expert witnesses is continued to February 25, 2013. The deadline to d esignate rebuttal expert witnesses is continued to March 22, 2013. The expert discovery cut-off is continued to April 15, 2013. The Pretrial Conference is continued to May 28, 2013. The trial date is continued to June 10, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 1, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES. The deadline to complete mediation is continued to March 1, 2013. The non-expert discovery cut-off is continued to November 27, 2012. The deadline to designate expert witnesses is continued to December 28, 2012. The deadline to designate rebuttal expert witnesses is continued to January 24, 2013. The expert discovery cut-off is continued to February 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES AND CONTINUE THE TRIAL. The deadline to complete mediation is continued to January 29, 2013. The non-expert discovery cut-off is continued to September 27, 2012. The deadline to designate expert witnesses is continued to October 29, 2012. The deadline to designate rebuttal expert witnesses is continued to November 29, 2012. The expert discovery cut-off is continued to January 14, 2013. The pretrial conferenc e is continued to April 2, 2013. The trial is continued to April 15, 2013. The Status Conference is continued from October 12, 2012 to January 11, 2013; a Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than January 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 21, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES AND CONTINUE THE TRIAL; ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The deadline to complete mediation is continued to October 31, 2012. The non-expert discovery cut-of f is continued to June 29, 2012. The deadline for designation of expert witnesses is continued to July 31, 2012. The deadline for designation of rebuttal expert witnesses is continued to August 31, 2012. The expert discovery cut-off is continued to October 15, 2012. The pretrial conference is continued to January 8, 2013. The trial is continued to January 28, 2013. The Status Conference is continued from June 29, 2012 to October 12, 2012; a Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than October 5, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 9, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. To the extent Twin Star's claims are based on the Group 1 and Group 2 definitions of injury, Universal Underwrit ers' motion for summary judgment is granted. To the extent Twin Star's claims are based on the Group 3 definition of injury, Universal Underwriters' motion for summary judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 20, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER VACATING MARCH 2, 2012 HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 29, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Protective Order for Standard Litigation. re 41 Stipulation filed by Universal Underwriters Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/9/2012. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ALLEGED DAMAGES, AND EXTENDING MEDIATION COMPLETION AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES. Discovery regarding damages is stayed until after a final determination on defendant's motion for summary judgmen t or partial summary judgment. The mediation completion deadline is extended to May 31, 2012. The non-expert discovery cut-off is extended to April 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 19, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULING ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATES AND CONTINUE THE TRIAL. The non-expert discovery cut-off is December 15, 2011. The deadline to designate expert witnesses is April 30, 2012. The deadline to des ignate rebuttal expert witnesses is May 29, 2012. The dispositive motion filing deadline is January 27, 2012. The expert discovery cut-off is June 28, 2012. The further status conference is June 29, 2012. The pretrial conference is September 11, 2012. The trial is September 24, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/27/2011. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADVANCING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference presently scheduled for November 18, 2011 is advanced to May 27, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement no later than May 20, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 10, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs shall file their proposed Second Amended Complaint no later than February 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/7/2011. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED. No later than October 15, 2010, defendant shall show cause in writing why the action should not be remanded. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twin Star Ventures, Inc et al v. Universal Underwriters Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin Star Ventures, Inc
Represented By: Robert Scott Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Earl Cameron
Represented By: Robert Scott Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Scott Cameron
Represented By: Robert Scott Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?