Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Golden Key Realty & Mortgage Banker, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Golden Key Realty & Mortgage Banker, Inc., Samuel Gbilia, First American Title Insurance Company, Stewart Title of Sacramento, Stewart Title Guaranty Company and United Capital Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv04285
Filed: September 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 JOINT CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation and against Golden Key Realty & Mortgage Banker, Inc., and Samuel Gbilia. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/1/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER TO BRING ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS to 2/28/2013 hearing. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/27/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE by Hon. William Alsup denying 102 Motion to Stay.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (3/18/2013) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (3/11/2013 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/8/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 88 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.Signed by Executive Committee on 3/20/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/8/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/7/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/6/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for Standard Litigation re 71 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 63 Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference re-set for 3/6/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/8/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 56 Stipulation to Extend Rrder Scheduling Jury Trial and Pretrial Matters filed by First American Title Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/7/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 49 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation is required to E-FILE the amended document (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/30/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 24 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/3/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Golden Key Realty & Mortgage Banker, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: David Lorenzo Fleck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Key Realty & Mortgage Banker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Gbilia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Capital Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?