OEM-Tech, Co. v. Video Gaming Technologies Inc
Plaintiff: OEM-Tech, Co.
Defendant: Video Gaming Technologies Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv04368
Filed: September 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RE: LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/31/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S REDACTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/20/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE SUBPOENAS (DKT. NO. 107). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/12/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER RE: DECEMBER 23, 2011 DISCOVERY DISPUTES (Dkt. Nos. 89, 91). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/10/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RE: HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS DECEMBER 23, 2011 LETTER (Dkt. No. 89). Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 1/9/2012 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/4/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS DECEMBER 23, 2011 LETTER (Dkt. No. 89). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/3/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 27 TO REMOVE C. KIPP WORDELL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/11. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/23/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO POSTPONE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET NEW HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AND FIFTH CLAIMS FOR RELIEF. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: 10 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/6/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OEM-Tech, Co. v. Video Gaming Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OEM-Tech, Co.
Represented By: John Stephen Knowlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Video Gaming Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?