IO Group, Inc., v. Does 1-50 Inclusive Featured Case
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc.,
Defendant: Does 1-50 Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2010cv04378
Filed: September 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE Defendant David Salery's re 53 Objection to Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/21/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 53 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Pro se Defendant DAVID SALERY. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF DEFENDANT DAVID HOLIHAN AND YOUNG LIN WITH PREJUDICE filed by IO Group, Inc., (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF DEFENDANT DAVID SALARY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by IO Group, Inc., (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 50 CONSENT to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by DAVID SALERY. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant MAYRA GONZALEZ with Prejudice filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 48 SEPARATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT; Certification of Interested Parties or Persons; Verification & Declaration filed by DAVID SALERY.(tnS) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss filed by pro se defendant David Salery is due 7/5/2011. Reply, if any shall be due 7/12/2011. The hearing remain scheduled for 7/26/2011 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte in courtroom F, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave, San Francisco, California. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE re consent as to Gonzalez. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 45 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 6/14/2011 before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Notice of dismissal as to Young Lin and Acevedo. There's a tentative agreement with Ms Gonzalez, counsel to file the dismissal within two days.Plaintiff's opposition to the motion filed by Pro Se Defendant David Salery is due 7/5. Reply shall be due 7/12, the hearing on the motion remain set for 7/26/2011. (Date Filed: 6/14/2011). (Recording #Ftr: 3:14pm - 3:27pm.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/14/2011)
June 11, 2011 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants: YOUNG LIN and LISELOTTE ACEVEDO with Prejudice filed by IO Group, Inc., (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/11/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 43 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Motion Hearing for 7/26/2011 at 9:00AM. (Attachments: #(1) proof of service) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE as to Salery. (Attachments: #(1) proof of service) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE as to Acevedo-Paquette. (Attachments: #(1) proof of service) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 40 CLERK'S Notice of ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendants Michael Welch, John Montgomery, Pedro Olivera, David Holihan & Young Lin. (Related documents(s) 37 ) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by IO Group, Inc. of re 37 Amended Request to Enter Default, re 36 Case Management Statement, re 35 Declaration in Support, re 34 Request to Enter Default at to Defendants MICHAEL WELCH, ROGER WOOWARD, JOHN MONTGOMERY, PEDRO OLIVERA, DAVID HOLIHAN, and YOUNG LIN, re 38 Declaration in Support, re 24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, re 32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal & re 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 38 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of re 37 Amended Request to Enter Default as to Defendants: Michael Welch, John Montgomery, Pedro Olivera, David Holihan & Young Lin filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 37 AMENDED Request to Enter Default as to Defendants: Michael Welch, John Montgomery, Pedro Olivera, David Holihan & Young Lin filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by IO Group, Inc.,. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 35 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of re 34 Request to Enter Default as to Defendants MICHAEL WELCH, ROGER WOOWARD, JOHN MONTGOMERY, PEDRO OLIVERA, DAVID HOLIHAN, and YOUNG LIN filed by IO Group, Inc.,. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 34 REQUEST to Enter Default as to Defendants MICHAEL WELCH, ROGER WOOWARD, JOHN MONTGOMERY, PEDRO OLIVERA, DAVID HOLIHAN, and YOUNG LIN filed by IO Group, Inc.,. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by IO Group, Inc.. Defendant GORDON J. BROOM served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant JOHN CAIRE served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant CHERYL CALHOUN served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant MAYRA GONZALEZ served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant DAVID HOLIHAN served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant YURY KALENIK served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant TIFFANY KENT served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant YOUNG LIN served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant JOHN MONTGOMERY served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant PEDRO OLIVERA served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; DAVID SALERY served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant JIM SORIANO served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Defendant MICHAEL WELCH served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011 & Defendant PETE WESSON served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Card Calhoun, # 2 Exhibit Return Card Kalenik, # 3 Exhibit Return Card Welch, # 4 Exhibit Return Card Salery, # 5 Exhibit Return Card Wesson, # 6 Exhibit Return Card Gonzales, # 7 Exhibit Return Card Broom, # 8 Exhibit Return Card Soriano, # 9 Exhibit Return Card Montgomery, # 10 Exhibit Return Card Olivera, # 11 Exhibit Return Card Kent, # 12 Exhibit Return Card Caire, # 13 Exhibit Return Card Holihan, # 14 Exhibit Return Card Lin)(Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants: CHERYL CALHOUN, YURY KALENIK, PETE WESSON, GORDON J. BROOM, JIM SORIANO, TIFFANY KENT, JOHN CAIRE, and RICHARD ZHU With Prejudice filed by IO Group, Inc., (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants: ANNA ARAGON, MIKE MURRAY, ELVIS BARNETT, LEE WILSON, FERNANDO OBERTI, ROGER WOODARD, LASONYA PITTMAN, KANG LI, and MONICA PAGE Without Prejudice filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Quash and General Defensesfiled by Pro se Defendant LISELOTTE ACEVEDO-Paquette. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Pro se Defendant DAVID SALERY. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AS TO DEFENDANT TIFFANY KENT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service as to kent)(cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONSTRUING DEFENDANT GONZALEZ'S MAY 16, 2011 LETTER AS AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service as to gonzalez)(cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 20, 2011 Filing 26 LETTER from Grant S. Dunham, Captain, United States Army, Legal Assistant Attorney, dated 5/17/2011 re Specialist Tiffany Kent. (tnS) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 25 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Pro se Defendant MAYRA GONZALEZ.(tnS) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 4, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2011. Case Management Conference re-set for 6/14/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AS MODIFIED extending time to serve Defendants and Resetting case management conference from 5/11/2011 to 6/14/2011 at 3:00 PM. re 22 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/4/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 3, 2011 Filing 23 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of re 22 Second Miscellaneous Administrative REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS AND TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by IO Group, Inc.,. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 3, 2011 Filing 22 Second Miscellaneous Administrative REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS AND TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 3, 2011 Filing 21 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants LISELOTTE ACEVEDO, ANNA ARAGON, ELVIS BARNETT, GORDON J. BROOM, JOHN CAIRE, CHERYL CALHOUN, MAYRA GONZALEZ, JERRY GUTHRIE, DAVID HOLIHAN, YURY KALENIK, TIFFANY KENT, KANG LI, YOUNG LIN, JOHN MONTGOMERY, MIKE MURRAY, FERNANDO OBERTI, PEDRO OLIVERA, MONICA PAGE, LASONYA PITTMAN, DAVID SALARY, JIM SORIANO, MICHAEL WELCH, PETE WESSON, LEE WILSON, ROGER WOOWARD & RICHARD ZHU. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 3, 2011 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT & JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against ELVIS BARNETT, CHERYL CALHOUN, ANNA ARAGON, KANG LI, YURY KALENIK, LEE WILSON, MICHAEL WELCH, DAVID SALARY, FERNANDO OBERTI, LASONYA PITTMAN, PETE WESSON, MONICA PAGE, MAYRA GONZALEZ, GORDON J. BROOM, ROGER WOOWARD, JIM SORIANO, JOHN MONTGOMERY, PEDRO OLIVERA, MIKE MURRAY, TIFFANY KENT, JOHN CAIRE, DAVID HOLIHAN, RICHARD ZHU, JERRY GUTHRIE, LISELOTTE ACEVEDO, YOUNG LIN. Filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Partial Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defedants 4, 11, 17, 25, 27, 28, 34, 35, 39, 44 & 50 WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by IO Group, Inc., (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Partial Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendants 5, 9, 14, 16, 18, 20, 21, 22, 23 & 37 WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE rescheduling case management conference from 5/10/2011 to 5/11/2011 at 4:15 p.m. Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2011 04:15 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Extending Plaintiff IO Group Inc.'s Time to Serve Doe Defendants & Re-setting Case Management Conference re 12 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 15 CONSENT to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 28, 2010 Filing 14 [Proposed] Order re 12 MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS AND TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by IO Group, Inc.,. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 28, 2010 Filing 13 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of re 12 Miscellanerous Administrative Request TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS AND TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 28, 2010 Filing 12 MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS AND TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 15, 2010 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference to 1/5/2011 03:00 PM before Judge Laporte in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 14, 2010 Filing 10 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 4 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to take early discovery. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 9, 2010 Filing 8 [Proposed] Order re 4 Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference Submitted by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/9/2010)
October 9, 2010 Filing 7 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of re 4 Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by IO Group, Inc.,. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Order)(Related document(s) 4 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/9/2010)
October 9, 2010 Filing 6 Declaration of Keith Ruoff in Support of re 4 Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A Copyright Registration Certificates)(Related document(s) 4 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/9/2010)
October 9, 2010 Filing 5 Declaration of Michael Eichner in Support of re 4 Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed by IO Group, Inc.,. (Related document(s) 4 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/9/2010)
October 9, 2010 Filing 4 Miscellaneous Administrative Request Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference filed filed by IO Group, Inc.,. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Sample Subpoena)(Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/9/2010)
September 28, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
September 28, 2010 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Copyright Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 12/28/2010 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 1/4/2011 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement & Civil Conspiracy & Jury Trial Demanded - [No Summons Issued] against Does 1-50 Inclusive, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611051123] Filed by Plaintiff IO Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IO Group, Inc., v. Does 1-50 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc.,
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?