IO Group, Inc. v. Does Featured Case
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc.
Defendant: Does
Case Number: 3:2010cv04382
Filed: September 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 4, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Doe defendant 1 by IO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 4/6/2011) Modified on 4/7/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2011 Filing 44 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference (Date Filed: 2/15/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2011 03:00 PM. ()Plaintiff was granted until 4/1/11 to serve Doe #1. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/15/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 43 Separate CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 2/4/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYNG MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff is directed to ifnorm the Court within 10 days of this Order of the status of Doe defendant No. 1.(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/3/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2011 Filing 41 * MOTION to Quash to/for Comcast to provide Defendant's name and address and other information as directed in the order from United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Dong Wu Li. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 40 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 39 Proposed Order re 37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 38 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of 37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed byIO Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by IO Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IO Group, Inc. re 31 Order (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 34 Proposed Order re 32 MOTION REQUEST FOR ORDER CONVERTING THE COURTS ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY ORDER TO AN ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY ORDER by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 33 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of 32 MOTION REQUEST FOR ORDER CONVERTING THE COURTS ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY ORDER TO AN ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY ORDER filed byIO Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION REQUEST FOR ORDER CONVERTING THE COURTS ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY ORDER TO AN ORDER TO STAY DISCOVERY ORDER filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SEVERING DOE 1 AND DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DOES 2 - 435 WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MODIFYING DISCOVERY ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 30 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2011 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on January 3, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS AND TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 25 , AND REASSIGNING CASE TO ARTICLE III JUDGE. Initial Case Management Conference before Magistrate Judge Ryu previously scheduled for 1/5/2011 has been VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/3/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 28, 2010 Filing 27 Proposed Order re 25 MOTION Extend time to serve Defendants and to reset CMC by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 28, 2010 Filing 26 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of 25 MOTION Extend time to serve Defendants and to reset CMC filed byIO Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 28, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION Extend time to serve Defendants and to reset CMC filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE to J.W. defendant pro se of 23 Order re Assignment of Severed Matter (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re Assignment of Severed Matter 20 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/2010. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Also filed in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order**
December 17, 2010 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO Defendant J.W. re 20 Order (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 15, 2010 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Severing Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendant J.W. and Setting Hearing Date on Defendant J.W.'s 11 Motion for Protective Order, 13 Motion to Quash, and 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Hearing re motions scheduled for January 27, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, US District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/15/2010. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).*** Also filed in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
December 15, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 13 Motion to Quash, 11 Motion for Protective Order, 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Hearing set for 1/27/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 8, 2010 Filing 19 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J.W. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Refiled in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
December 6, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE RE: Order Compliance by J.W. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Refiled in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
November 29, 2010 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IO Group, Inc. re 15 Order (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 11/29/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Refiled in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
November 29, 2010 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO PRO SE DEFENDANT re 15 Order Staying Compliance with Subpoena (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Refiled in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu STAYING Compliance With Subpoena. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Also filed in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
November 22, 2010 Filing 14 Declaration of J.W. in Support of 13 MOTION to Quash, 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by J.W. (Related document(s) 13 , 12 ) (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Refiled in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
November 22, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION to Quash filed by J.W. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Refiled in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
November 22, 2010 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by J.W. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Refiled in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
November 22, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION for Protective Order filed by J.W. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).***Refiled in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
November 9, 2010 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IO Group, Inc... (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 11/9/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).*** Also filed in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu GRANTING 4 Plaintiff's Administrative Request for Leave to Take Early Discovery. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 8 Proposed Order re 4 MOTION LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26 CONFERENCE by IO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/8/2010) Modified on 10/12/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2010 Filing 7 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of 4 MOTION LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26 CONFERENCE filed by IO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order)(Related document(s) 4 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/8/2010) Modified on 10/12/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2010 Filing 6 Declaration of Keith Ruoff in Support of 4 MOTION LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26 CONFERENCE filed by IO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1 Copyright Registration Certificates, # 2 Exhibit A-2 Copyright Registration Certificates, # 3 Exhibit A-3 Copyright Registration Certificates)(Related document(s) 4 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/8/2010) Modified on 10/12/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2010 Filing 5 Declaration of Michael Eichner in Support of 4 MOTION LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26 CONFERENCE filed by IO Group, Inc. (Related document(s) 4 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/8/2010) Modified on 10/12/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2010 Filing 4 MOTION LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26 CONFERENCE filed by IO Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sample Subpoena)(Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2010. Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Does (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611051123). Filed by IO Group, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).).***Also filed in 4:10cv-5821DMR pursuant to severing order***
September 28, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IO Group, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc.
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?