Clark v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Peter C. Clark
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Bruce Mills
Case Number: 3:2010cv04481
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE 29 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/24/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/23/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/14/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/14/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: 15 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE RE: SERVICE OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/11/11. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO E-FILE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/8/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: 4 DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/6/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?