Best Buy Co., Inc. et al v. AU Optronics Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Purchasing LLC, Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Best Buy Stores, L.P., Best Buy China Ltd. and Magnolia Hi-Fi, Inc.
Defendant: AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, Chi Mei Corp., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corp., Chi Mei Optoelectronics, USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corp., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corp., Seiko Epson Corporation, Sharp Corp., Sharp Electronics Corp. and Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04572
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER for Entry of Judgment and Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/6/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ORDER DENYING BEST BUY'S OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER - No. C 10-4572 SI 8903 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER RE BEST BUY'S OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER 8914 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER REFERRING BEST BUY'S BILL OF COSTS AND MOTION FOR FEES AND COSTS TO SPECIAL MASTER QUINN FOR DETERMINATION IN THE FIRST INSTANCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER GRANTING HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10./16/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting Stipulation to amend briefing schedule 615 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/16/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 584 SPECIAL VERDICT (POST CONFERENCE) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 FORM OF SPECIAL VERDICT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER RE NEC (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER RE BEST BUY'S TRIAL BRIEF RE (1) FRE 1006 SUMMARY WITNESS AND (2) DR. McCLAVE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER DISMISSING PROSPECTIVE JURORS. The parties have agreed to dismiss certain jurors from service for trial commencing on July 22,2013. Having reviewed the proposed list of jurors to be excused, the Court dismisses Jurors 1, 10, 13,and 20. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/19/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 451 FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - PHASE I DAP TRIAL 8118 8119 8120 8121 8122 8123 8124 8125 8126 8127 8128 8129 8130 8131 8133 8134 8136 8137 8138 8139 8140 8214 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8229) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING PRESENCE OF WITNESSES IN THE COURTROOM (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting (8156) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI to shorten time on motion for separate trial (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARTIES' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY 7842 7844 7847 7850 7852 7853 7854 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER RE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRACK 1B AND TRACK 2 CASES) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7431) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Hitachi Defendants (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 310 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, filed by Tatung Company of America, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/20/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DISMISSING BEST BUY'S PRE-OCTOBER 8, 2006 CLAIMS AS TIME-BARRED AND FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF BEST BUY'S FAILURE TO MITIGATE DAMAGES; GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 6174 6379 6924 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION AND TOSHIBA'S SEPARATE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF STANDING UNDER ILLINOIS BRICK AND IN RE ATM FEE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER FOR FURTHER DECLARATIONS RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PURCHASES OF PANELS MADE BY SUPPOSED CONSPIRATORS NOT ALLEGED IN THE COMPLAINTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER STRIKING EXPERT REPORTS 260 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 6139 6142 6150 6162 6171 6172 6175 6180] 6181 6188 6191 6192 6200 6201 6202 6206 6211 6214 6241 6248 6252 6253 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME 181 183 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC. AND LG DISPLAY CO., LTD.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 5275 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO DISCLOSE ANTHONY NANNI AS EXPERT WITNESS IN THE BEST BUY CASE 137 in case 3:10-cv-04572-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME - BEST BUY 5392 139 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re: discovery and motion to compel deadlines (4562). Signed by Judge Illston on 1/19/12. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re: Discovery and Motion to Compel Deadlines by Hannstar Display Corporation (4343) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Re: 3rd Party Discovery (#4311) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Re: deadline to file answer (filed by Hannstar) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order on Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Best Buy Purchasing LLC, Best Buy Stores, L.P., Magnolia Hi-Fi, Inc. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Withdrawing Joint Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Hannstar Display Corp.. (Wyant, Christoher) (Filed on 5/26/2011) (Entered: 05/26/2011) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (CHUNGHWA) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES THOUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING certain parties (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011) Modified on 2/16/2011 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting extension of time to answer (Best Buy v. AU) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best Buy Co., Inc. et al v. AU Optronics Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Buy Purchasing LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Buy China Ltd.
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnolia Hi-Fi, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seiko Epson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?