Sierra Bay Contractors, Inc. v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sierra Bay Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv04611
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 177 FOR DISMISSAL OF OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION AND VIRGINIA SURETY COMPANY, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/31/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 171 FOR DISMISSAL OF ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/21/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 157 FOR DISMISSAL OF CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY AND NATIONAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 153 FOR DISMISSAL OF INTERSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/21/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/17/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012) Modified on 11/15/2012 (cl, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 143 FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-DEFENDANT AMERICAN SAFETY INDEMNITY COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/7/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 141 FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AGAINST AMERICAN SAFETY INDEMNITY COMPANY, IN EXCHANGE FOR A WAIVER OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 138 FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AGAINIST LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY IN EXCHANGE FOR A WAIVER OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/30/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 122 FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-DEFENDANT NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FORMERLY KNOWN AS NIC INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/30/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 113 TO ALLOW THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, TO FILE A CROSS-CLAIM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 109 TO ALLOW THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY, TO FILE A CROSS-CLAIM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR.Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 2/11/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/11/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT ASPEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/13/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 87 FOR DISMISSAL OF THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Stipulation filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/31/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE 83 LIFTING DEFAULT TO ALLOW LIBERTY SURPLUS INSURANCE CORPORATION TO FILE AN ANSWER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT FEDERATED SERVICE INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 75 FOR DISMISSAL OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 24 LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT, WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/21/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: 5 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/6/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Bay Contractors, Inc. v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Bay Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen John Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?