Facebook, Inc. v. Pedersen Featured Case
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Thomas Pedersen
Case Number: 3:2010cv04673
Filed: October 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2012 Filing 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 36 . Objections due by 3/16/2012. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 3/2/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
December 12, 2011 Filing 48 Declaration in Support of 47 Response to Order to Show Cause of Jeffrey T. Norberg filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit C (Part 2), # 5 Exhibit C (Part 3), # 6 Exhibit C (Part 4))(Related document(s) 47 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 47 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Facebook, Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: 36 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/29/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 17, 2011 ***Case Management Conference terminated pursuant to: 36 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Default Judgment an dPermanent Injunction, an dRequest for Attorneys' Fees Fixed by the Court filed by Facebook, Inc.. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 45 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg in Support of 41 Brief, Second Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg ISO Motion for Attorneys Fees filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 41 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 44 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu finding as moot 42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 43 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg in Support of 41 Brief, Supplemental Brief filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 13, 2011 Filing 42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg and Exhibits A and B filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 13, 2011 Filing 41 Brief re 36 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Default Judgment an dPermanent Injunction, an dRequest for Attorneys' Fees Fixed by the Court Supplemental Brief filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 39 Order Requesting Supplemental Briefing (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/07/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING MOTION FOR DEGAULT JUDGMENT to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S White on 9/30/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 37 Declaration of Jeffrey Norberg in Support of 36 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Default Judgment an dPermanent Injunction, an dRequest for Attorneys' Fees Fixed by the Court filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Default Judgment an dPermanent Injunction, an dRequest for Attorneys' Fees Fixed by the Court filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 10/13/2011. Replies due by 10/20/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memo of Points and Authorities in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 32 Motion to Continue Date of Status Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.Case Management Conference to be vacated without further order upon filing of Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 27, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION to Continue Date of Status Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/22/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REFERRING CASE to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes Status Conference set for 9/30/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/20/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 28 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Thomas Pedersen. (Related documents(s) 25 )(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 26 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg in Support of 25 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Thomas Pedersen filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Thomas Pedersen filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 24 ***erroneous docket entry***CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) Modified on 5/26/2011 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2011 Filing 23 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Retro Invent AS. (Related documents(s) 21 )(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 22 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg in Support of 21 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Retro Invent AS filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Retro Invent AS filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Facebook, Inc.. Retro Invent AS served on 4/4/2011, answer due 4/25/2011. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Facebook, Inc., Thomas Pedersen served on 4/29/2011, answer due 5/20/2011. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/19/2011) Modified on 5/19/2011 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2011 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 11 Summons Issued, 7 Amended Complaint,,, (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 12 Summons Issued, 7 Amended Complaint,,, (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 14 Second MOTION to Continue Date of Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 15 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg in Support of 14 Second MOTION to Continue Date of Initial Case Management Conference filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 14 Second MOTION to Continue Date of Initial Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Facebook's Motion to Continue Date of CMC)(Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 8 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Thomas Pedersen. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 12 (AMENDED) Summons Issued as to Thomas Pedersen. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/14/2011 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Retro Invent AS. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 9 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg in Support of 8 MOTION Administrative Motion to Continue Date of Initial Case Management Conference filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 8 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION Administrative Motion to Continue Date of Initial Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Administrative Motion to Continue Date of Initial Case Management Conference)(Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT SEEKING DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR (1) Federal Trademark Dilution, 15 U.S.C. § 1125; (2) Trademark Dilution Under Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code § 14247; (3) False Designation of Origin, 15 U.S.C. § 1125; (4) Federal Trademark Infringement (FACEBOOK), 15 U.S.C. §1114; (5) Common Law Trademark Infringement; (6) Violation of the Anti-Cybersquatting Consumer Protection Act, 15 U.S.C. §1125(D); (7) Federal Trademark Infringement (WALL), 15 U.S.C. §1114; (8) Common Law Trademark Infringement; (9) Common Law Unfair Competition; (10) Unfair Competition Under Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code §§17200, et. seq. against Thomas Pedersen. Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 2, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/19/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thomas Pedersen. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Pedersen ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008329.). Filed byFacebook, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2011: # 1 part2, # 2 part3, # 3 part4, # 4 part5, # 5 part6) (hdj, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Norberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?