IPVenture, Inc. et al v. Cellco Partnership et al
Plaintiff: IPVenture, Inc
Defendant: Cellco Partnership, AT&T, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation and Sprint Spectrum, LP
Case Number: 3:2010cv04755
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING 115 STIPULATION for Dismissal and Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 113 STIPULATION Requesting 30-Day Continuance of Case Schedule: Tutorial Hearing set for 6/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/12/2012 01:30 PM. Amended Pleadings due by 6/25/2012. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/7/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING 110 STIPULATION Requesting 30-Day Continuance of Case Schedule. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/21/2012 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 3/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING 108 Stipulation Regarding Deadline for Amending Pleadings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/1/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 106 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion Under Civil L.R. 7-11 Requesting a Continuance of the Claim Construction Tutorial and Hearing Date Due to a Scheduling Conflict. Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/22/2012 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 2/15/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING 97 Stipulation To Extend Marking Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING 92 Stipulation for Dismissal and Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re 86 Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/2/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDERRE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/27/11. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 81 Stipulation Regarding Pre-Markman Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/2/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/4/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 27 Motion to Dismiss; granting 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting 35 Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC, 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cellco Partnership, and 35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sprint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 20, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulation to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 17, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Willful Infringement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPVenture, Inc. et al v. Cellco Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPVenture, Inc
Represented By: Mary E Kiedrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Spectrum, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?