Adams v. Albertson et al
Plaintiff: Mark Letell Adams
Defendant: Ronald Albertson, Michael Anderson, Justin Council, Evelina Bozek, Stephen Hall, Linda Noeske, City of San Carlos and County of San Mateo
Case Number: 3:2010cv04787
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND VACATING MAY 31 HEARING by Hon. William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 217 Motion for Sanctions]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup [granting 237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO RE-NOTICE MOTIONS re 230 Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 16, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 224 Motion to Disqualify Judge. The 4/20/12 hearing is vacated. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER REFERRING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL RECUSAL re 224 First MOTION to Disqualify Judge William H. Alsup filed by Mark Letell Adams. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 19, 2012.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 159 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER CONFIRMING FEBRUARY 9 HEARING DATE re 203 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTIFICATION OF POTENTIAL RESCHEDULING. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER DENYING SECOND PRECIS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE re 155 Letter filed by Mark Letell Adams. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 27, 2011. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING PRECIS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 153 Letter filed by Mark Letell Adams. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 21, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER DENYING PRECIS REQUEST TO FILE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE re 150 Letter filed by Mark Letell Adams, 152 Letter filed by Justin Council, Michael Anderson, City of San Carlos Police Department, City of San Carlos, Ronald Albertson, Greg Rothaus. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 20, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING PRECIS REQUESTS re 150 Letter filed by Mark Letell Adams, 147 Letter filed by Justin Council, Michael Anderson, City of San Carlos, Ronald Albertson, Greg Rothaus. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 15, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER GRANTING PRECIS TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 147 Letter filed by Justin Council, Michael Anderson, City of San Carlos, Ronald Albertson, Greg Rothaus. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 DISCOVERY ORDER re 143 Letter filed by Justin Council, Michael Anderson, City of San Carlos Police Department, City of San Carlos, Ronald Albertson, Greg Rothaus, 146 Letter filed by Mark Letell Adams. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/8/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RE: FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 12/1/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DISCOVERY ORDER re 127 Objection filed by San Carlos Elementary School District. Plaintiff and School District to meet and confer. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/14/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER re 122 Order, 123 Letter filed by Mark Letell Adams. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/9/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DISCOVERY ORDER re 119 Letter, 120 Letter. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/7/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DISCOVERY ORDER re 117 Letter, filed by Mark Letell Adams. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/26/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/25/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 24, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RE-ISSUANCE OF MODIFIED SUBPOENA, GRANTING MOVANT'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion to Quash]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND re 84 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Mark Letell Adams. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 4, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 68 Motion to Dismiss; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting 19 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 20 Motion to Strike ; granting 23 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 21, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William Alsup [denying 30 Motion to Continue]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Albertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Letell Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Albertson
Represented By: Joseph C. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anderson
Represented By: Joseph C. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Council
Represented By: Joseph C. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelina Bozek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Hall
Represented By: Thomas A. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Noeske
Represented By: Joseph C. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Carlos
Represented By: Joseph C. Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Represented By: Ceide Zapparoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?