Lynch v. Holy See et al
Plaintiff: William Lynch
Defendant: Holy See, Archdiocese of Oakland in California, Roman Catholic Archbishop of Oakland in California, The, Jesuit Order of Oakland, The and Christian Family Movement, The
Case Number: 3:2010cv04878
Filed: October 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The Court finds that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction over the claims in plaintiffs complaint, and hereby DISMISSES the above-titled action without prejudice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION; DENYING AS MOOT ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF OAKLANDS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 24, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION; VACATING MARCH 18, 2011 HEARING ON ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF OAKLAND'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE . Lynch is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than March 18, 2011, why the instant action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Bishop shall file any reply to Lynch's response no late r than March 28, 2011. As of March 28, 2011, the Court will take the matter under submission. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 25, 2011 to May 13, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. The hearing on the Bishop's motion to dismiss, presently scheduled for March 18, 2011 is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 1, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT CHRISTIAN FAMILY MOVEMENTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff having filed on February 4, 2011 a Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant The Christian Family Movement, the motion to dismiss filed January 21, 2011 by The Christian Family Movement is denied as moot, and the March 11, 2011 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 11, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT CHRISTIAN FAMILY MOVEMENT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Dfts Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland and The Christian Family Movement shall have until 1/21/11 to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/13/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. Holy See et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lynch
Represented By: Tamar G Arminak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of Oakland in California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop of Oakland in California, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesuit Order of Oakland, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Family Movement, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?