Tria Beauty, Inc. v. Radiancy, Inc
Plaintiff: Tria Beauty, Inc.
Defendant: Radiancy, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv05030
Filed: November 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 209 FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/2/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER excusing counterclaim defendant Kim Kardashian and attorney Michael Kump's attendance at the July 6, 2012 settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/27/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2012 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 8/24/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 8/27/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 185 GRANTING REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING RADIANCY'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/14/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER RE 173 Granting Modification of the Briefing Schedule Regarding Radiancy's Motion to Strike the Simonson Declaration. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Seeborg Re 153 Motion to Shorten Time (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 124 GRANTING REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER RE 104 GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PROPOSED MODIFICATION TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/5/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RELIEVING KRISTIN H. NEUMAN AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF RADIANCY, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/23/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER RELIEVING DOLORES D. DIBELLA AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF RADIANCY, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/22/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 7/23/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 1 7th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 7/23/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/17/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re 55 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Tria Beauty, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/19/11. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE 41 GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2012 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2012 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 7/9/2012 9:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 7/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: 17 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/28/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tria Beauty, Inc. v. Radiancy, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiancy, Inc
Represented By: Robert H. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tria Beauty, Inc.
Represented By: Peter M. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?