Manzo et al v. Hall Vineland Property, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Octavio Pena, Jesus Ledesma, Irma Zavala, Sigrid Dobat, Antonio Manzo, Maria Manzo, Jesus Rios, Laura Rios, Gabriel Deharo and Maria Deharo
Defendant: Kathryn Hall and Hall Vineland Property, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv05279
Filed: November 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RESCHEDULING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 28 Case Management Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE OPPOSITION OBJECTION [re 43 Objection filed by Hall Vineland Property, LLC, Kathryn Hall]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/21/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER PERMITTING CHANGE OF COUNSEL re 33 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Hall Vineland Property, LLC, Kathryn Hall, 34 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Hall Vineland Property, LLC, Kathryn Hall. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS EXCEPT AS TO CERTAIN CLAIMS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Stipulation filed by Hall Vineland Property, LLC, Kathryn Hall]. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco, following hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/9/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manzo et al v. Hall Vineland Property, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Hall
Represented By: Henry E. Heater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall Vineland Property, LLC
Represented By: Henry E. Heater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavio Pena
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Ledesma
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Zavala
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigrid Dobat
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Manzo
Represented By: Ilene J. Jacobs
Represented By: Jeffery Hoffman
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Manzo
Represented By: Ilene J. Jacobs
Represented By: Jeffery Hoffman
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Rios
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Rios
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Deharo
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Jeffery Hoffman
Represented By: Ilene J. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Deharo
Represented By: Craig D. Castellanet
Represented By: D. Scott Chang
Represented By: Jeffery Hoffman
Represented By: Ilene J. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?