Marshall v. Pacific Office Automation
Plaintiff: Michael Marshall
Defendant: Pacific Office Automation
Case Number: 3:2010cv05406
Filed: November 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/31/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING re 27 Letter filed by Michael Marshall for Victor C. Thuesen to appear by phone on 6/3/11.**NOTE: Court will contact the parties using the conference call number that has been established by Mr. Thuesen**. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/23/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING re 25 Letter filed by Pacific Office Automation for Rochelle Wilcox to appear by phone on 6/3/11 at 1:30 PM. Court will initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/20/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING re 17 Letter filed by Michael Marshall for telephonic appearance on 3/18/11 at 1:30 PM. Counsel shall establish a conference call number and pass code by 3/16/11 for the 3/18 hearing. Please consult the website for further information. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/11/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING re 15 Letter filed by Pacific Office Automation for Rochelle Wilcox to appear by phone on 3/18/11 at 1:30 PM for the case management conference.Counsel shall be on phone standby and await the Court's call. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/10/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 3/18/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/8/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Pacific Office Automation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Marshall
Represented By: Victor Clark Thuesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Office Automation
Represented By: Rochelle L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?