Rambus, Inc. v. STMicroElectronics, N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Rambus, Inc.
Defendant: STMicroElectronics, N.V. and STMicroelectronics, Inc.
Miscellaneous: Mediatek Inc. and Freescale Semiconductor Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv05449
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/19/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE 157 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/28/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Spoliation Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2013 10:00 AM; Spoliation/Unclean Hands Jury Selection set for 8/26/2013 09:00 AM; Spoliation/Unclean Hands Jury Trial set for 8/26/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor , San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 4/14/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 4/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/15/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/15/2013 (cl, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 115 ADR. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rambus, Inc. v. STMicroElectronics, N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rambus, Inc.
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Gregory P. Stone
Represented By: Peter A. Detre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STMicroElectronics, N.V.
Represented By: Elaine Y. Chow
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: Deirdre M. Digrande
Represented By: Stephen Michael Everett
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Represented By: Curt Holbreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STMicroelectronics, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Bettinger
Represented By: Elaine Y. Chow
Represented By: Deirdre M. Digrande
Represented By: Stephen Michael Everett
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Represented By: Curt Holbreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Mediatek Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Louis Lippetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Freescale Semiconductor Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Louis Lippetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?