Shire LLC, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Incl et al v. IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shire LLC, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Amy F.T, Arnsten, Pasko Rakic and Robert D. Hunt
Defendant: IMPAX Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida, Watson Pharma, Inc and Anda, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv05467
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Discovery Order re: 236 Joint Discovery Letter Brief to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James Regarding Discovery Issues filed by IMPAX Laboratories, Inc... Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/25/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 232 Discovery Letter Brief (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 DISCOVERY ORDER re 223 Letter, filed by Shire LLC, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc, IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/26/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion to shorten time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 216 TO DISMISS IMPAX'S COUNTERCLAIM REGARDING THE '290 PATENT AND AMY F.T. ARNSTEN, PASKO RAKIC, AND ROBERT D. HUNT; TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS; AND NOT TO APPEAL FINDING OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE '290 PATENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 7/8/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 7/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/5/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER GRANTING RE 150 JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND IMPAX LABORATORIES, INC.'S INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/30/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER AUTHORIZING COUNSEL FOR WATSON DEFENDANTS TO BRING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/29/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER AUTHORIZING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS TO BRING ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RE 172 GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER RE 168 GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/23/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 141 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING WATSON DEFENDANTS' STIPULATED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 TO CURE DOCKETING ERRORS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Waiver of Requirements for Service re 128 Stipulation filed by Shire LLC, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Pasko Rakic, Amy F.T, Arnsten, Robert D. Hunt. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/4/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/7/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE by Judge Seeborg (rslc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE 103 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT, SCHEDULING ORDER, AND ORDER ON PRESUMPTIVE LIMIT OF HOURS FOR INVENTORS' DEOPSITIONS. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Markman hearing set for 5/2/2012 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/15/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 69 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUE ADR DEADLINES. Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeoborg on 2/18/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.-FLORIDA, WATSON PHARMA, INC. AND ANDA, INC.'S DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/6/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: 9 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/7/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shire LLC, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Incl et al v. IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire LLC, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy F.T, Arnsten
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasko Rakic
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Hunt
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMPAX Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida, Watson Pharma, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?