Illumina Inc. et al v. Complete Genomics Inc.
Plaintiff: Illumina Inc. and Solexa Inc.
Defendant: Complete Genomics Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv05542
Filed: December 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF CLAIMS 1, 9, 10, AND 14-19 OF THE 597 PATENT. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/26/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER re 237 Declaration in Support, filed by Complete Genomics Inc., 238 Letter filed by Illumina Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 2/22/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER SETTING 205 MOTION for Reconsideration re 197 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Regarding Claims 14 and 15 Responses due by 12/14/2012. Replies due by 12/21/2012. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/4/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER re 200 Status Report filed by Illumina Inc., Complete Genomics Inc. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/7/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 198 STIPULATION TO VACATE SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Complete Genomics Inc. ***Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 10/30/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND RESET HEARING FOR DEFENDANT'S 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Replies due by 7/10/2012. Responses due by 6/29/2012. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/14/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 140 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Schedule and Reset Motion Deadlines and Pretrial and Trial Dates filed by Illumina Inc., Complete Genomics Inc., Motions terminated: 140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Discovery Schedule and Reset Motion Deadlines and Pretrial and Trial Dates filed by Illumina Inc., Complete Genomics Inc. Discovery due by 9/14/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 3/29/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/3 0/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 8/19/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2013 through 8/30/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/30/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/30/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re 135 Stipulation filed by Illumina Inc., Complete Genomics Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/23/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 125 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Schedule and Set Motion Deadlines and Pretrial and Trial Dates filed by Illumina Inc., Complete Genomics Inc. Discovery due by 6/22/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/201 3. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 5/13/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Jury Trial set for 5/13/2013 through 5/24/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 2/27/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER requiring Joint Statement or Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/8/2012. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 118 FOR FILING AMENDED PLEADINGS filed by Complete Genomics Inc.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/31/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Following Claim Construction Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/17/2012. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER RETTING FURTHER CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Claims Construction Hearing set for 1/11/2012 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/21/2011. (knsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PAGE LIMITS FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 10/21/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 9/23/2011 to complete mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/11/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Schedule for Claim Construction Disclosure and Briefing re 79 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 08/03/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 53 Stipulation filed by Illumina Inc., Solexa Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 48 MOTION to Stay NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY. Responses due by 3/4/2011. Replies due by 3/11/2011. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2011 10:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/18/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED ORDER re 51 Stipulation filed by Complete Genomics Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/28/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding granting of Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Robert F. Kelly on 11/9/2010. (dlk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illumina Inc. et al v. Complete Genomics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illumina Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solexa Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Genomics Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Caulfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?