Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. Nike, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC
Defendant: Nike Inc and Apple Inc
Mediator: Edward A Infante
Case Number: 3:2010cv05543
Filed: December 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/7/10. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 7, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 28 Sealed Motion to transfer venue. Pending before the court is the dfts Nike Inc and Apple Inc motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of California. Having considered the arguments of counsel the court GRANTS the motion. In light of the transfer of venue, the court suspens any anf all pending deadlines as indicated in the Docket Control Order. Likewise, the court suspends any deadline under the Local Rules for responding to pending motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/4/2010. (ch, )
October 16, 2010 Filing 67 NOTICE by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC AMENDED NOTICE OF LIMITING NUMBER OF ASSERTED CLAIMS (Yuan, Wesley)
October 15, 2010 Filing 66 NOTICE by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC NOTICE OF LIMITING THE NUMBER OF ASSERTED CLAIMS (Yuan, Wesley)
October 12, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Yuan, Wesley)
October 11, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE by Apple Inc, Nike Inc OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-1 (Whilt, Nicholas)
October 5, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE by Apple Inc, Nike Inc Notice of Compliance with Patent Local Rule 3-4 (Whilt, Nicholas)
October 1, 2010 Filing 62 NOTICE by Apple Inc, Nike Inc of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions (Glasser, Darin)
September 30, 2010 Filing 61 ANSWER to 59 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Nike by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC.(Fowles, Jordan)
September 30, 2010 Filing 60 ANSWER to 58 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Apple by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC.(Fowles, Jordan)
September 10, 2010 Filing 59 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC by Nike Inc. (Harris, Michael)
September 10, 2010 Filing 58 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC by Apple Inc. (Glasser, Darin)
August 24, 2010 Filing 57 NOTICE by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC of P.R. 3-2 DOCUMENT PRODUCTION ACCOMPANYING DISCLOSURE (Yuan, Wesley)
August 17, 2010 Filing 56 NOTICE by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC of Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Yuan, Wesley)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
July 22, 2010 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Protective Order regarding Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Protective Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasser, Darin)
July 9, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple Inc That Apple Inc. Served its Mandatory Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (Glasser, Darin)
July 9, 2010 Filing 52 NOTICE of Disclosure by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC's Notice of Service of Manadatory Disclosures (Yuan, Wesley)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Deadline extended to 7/23/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/9/10. (ehs, )
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AGREED DICOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/8/2010. (ch, )
July 8, 2010 Filing 49 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Nike Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
July 6, 2010 Filing 48 AGREED MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order by Nike Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) Modified on 7/7/2010 (sm, ).
July 2, 2010 Filing 47 BRIEF filed by Defendants in further support of transfer to the NDCA by Apple Inc, Nike Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order from SMG v. Apple et al, # 2 Exhibit Brief from MedIdea v. Zimmer)(Glasser, Darin)
July 2, 2010 Filing 46 BRIEF filed Further Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Per Court's June 25, 2010 Order by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Sankey, Thomas)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Edward A. Infante, 2 Embarcadero Center, Suite 1100, San Francisco, California, telephone number 415.982.5267 and fax number 415.982.5287, is hereby appointed as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/1/2010. (ch, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2010., Markman Hearing set for 3/10/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Deadlines set for here in. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/1/10. (ehs, )
June 25, 2010 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 6/25/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
June 21, 2010 Filing 42 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Yuan, Wesley)
June 21, 2010 Filing 41 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 28 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendandants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement to Frost Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Supplemental Frost Declaration)(Yuan, Wesley)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 38 Joint Motion to Extend Local Patent Rules 3-1, 3-2, 3-3 and 3-4 Deadlines. Deadlines are modified as follows herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/15/2010. (ch, )
June 14, 2010 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendandants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Apple Inc, Nike Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Glasser, Darin)
June 11, 2010 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Extend Certain Local Patent Rule Deadlines by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yuan, Wesley)
June 7, 2010 Filing 37 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM is Unamended against Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC by Apple Inc. (Glasser, Darin)
June 4, 2010 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 28 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendandants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Response & Opposition, # 2 Exhibit B to Response & Opposition, # 3 Affidavit Harlie Frost, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Harlie Frost, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of HarleyFrost, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Harley Frost, # 7 Affidavit Russell White, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yuan, Wesley)
June 3, 2010 Filing 35 RESPONSE to 21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Reply to Counterclaim of Defendnat Nike, Inc. by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Yuan, Wesley)
June 3, 2010 Filing 34 RESPONSE to 25 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Reply to Counterclaim of Defendant Apple, Inc. by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Yuan, Wesley)
June 1, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas W Sankey (Sankey, Thomas)
May 28, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wesley W Yuan on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (Yuan, Wesley)
May 26, 2010 Filing 31 Notice of Scheduling Conference and Proposed Deadlines for Docket Control Order Containing Discovery Order. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2010 10:10 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/26/10. (ehs, )
May 24, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2010, 10:10 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Nike Inc and Apple Incs Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/2010. (ch, ) Modified on 5/18/2010 (ch, ).
May 17, 2010 Filing 28 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendandants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc, Nike Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20)(Albritton, Eric)
May 17, 2010 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Supporting Exhibits by Apple Inc, Nike Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 17, 2010 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc (Albritton, Eric)
May 17, 2010 Filing 25 Defendant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC by Apple Inc.(Albritton, Eric)
May 17, 2010 Filing 24 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Darin J. Glasser,George A Riley,Nicholas J Whilt,Ryan K Yagura for Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 PHV Riley, # 2 PHV Whilt, # 3 PHV Yagura RECEIPT 2-1-5366)(rml, )
May 17, 2010 Filing 23 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Audra Carol Eidem Heinze,Christopher J Renk,Erik S Maurer,Michael J Harris for Nike Inc,Audra Carol Eidem Heinze,Christopher J Renk,Erik S Maurer,Michael J Harris for Nike Inc. (Attachments: # 1 PHV Renk, # 2 PHV Maurer, # 3 PHV Harris RECEIPT 2-1-5364)(rml, )
May 17, 2010 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nike Inc (Hill, Jack)
May 17, 2010 Filing 21 Nike, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC by Nike Inc.(Hill, Jack)
April 6, 2010 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nike Inc.(Hill, Jack)
April 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nike Inc to 5/17/2010. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Nike Inc personally served Nancy Kerper Senior Administrative Assistant on 3/11/2010, answer due 5/3/2010. (ehs, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Apple Inc personally served on 3/10/2010 on Stan Flemister, Legal Administrator, answer due 5/17/2010. (ehs, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 17 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 16 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Albritton, Eric) Modified on 3/29/2010 (ehs, ).
March 29, 2010 Filing 16 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 17 ***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Albritton, Eric) Modified on 3/29/2010 (ehs, ).
March 29, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple Inc (Albritton, Eric)
March 29, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR per attorney. Document # 16, Application. PLEASE IGNORE. See corrected document # 17 *** (ehs, )
March 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc to 5/17/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 14 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian McQuillen for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5262) (ehs, )
March 23, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR, TO BE FILED ONLY BY CLERK, ATTY MUST SUBMIT ORIG DOCUMENTS TO CLERK FOR FILING. Document # 10 and #11, Notices of proof of service. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 13 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew Christopher Gaudet for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5260 (ch, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 12 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephanie Hansen for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5260 (ch, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC Proof of Service for Nike Inc. (Fowles, Jordan) Modified on 3/23/2010 (sm, ).
March 22, 2010 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC Proof of Service for Apple Inc. (Fowles, Jordan) Modified on 3/23/2010 (sm, ).
March 22, 2010 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nike Inc. (Hill, Jack)
March 22, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Nike Inc (Hill, Jack)
March 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nike Inc to 5/3/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 11, 2010 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (Fowles, Jordan)
March 11, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan Thomas Fowles on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (Fowles, Jordan)
March 10, 2010 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Nike Inc)(ch, )
February 18, 2010 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Sankey, Thomas)
February 17, 2010 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (ehs, )
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/17/10. (ehs, )
February 17, 2010 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 6-1-0021113 (ehs, )
February 16, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sankey, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2010: # 5 filing receipt) (ehs, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. Nike, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Jordan Thomas Fowles
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Gaudet
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Hansen
Represented By: Brian McQuillen
Represented By: Thomas W Sankey
Represented By: Wesley W Yuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike Inc
Represented By: Audra Carol Eidem Heinze
Represented By: Michael J Harris
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Erik S Maurer
Represented By: Christopher J Renk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Darin J. Glasser
Represented By: George A. Riley
Represented By: Nicholas J Whilt
Represented By: Ryan K. Yagura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Edward A Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?