Miller v. Paul Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristen L. Miller
Defendant: Paul Financial LLC, OneWest Bank, FSB and NDEX West LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv05562
Filed: December 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the California State Bar. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/24/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tmi, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff to show cause as to why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file a timely opposition to 11 Defendant OneWest Bank, FSB's motion to dismiss. Show Cause Response and opposition to motion due by 2/23/2011. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/15/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tmi, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT OR DECLINE FORM BY 1/7/11. Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/28/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Paul Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen L. Miller
Represented By: Gregory Alan Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB
Represented By: Keith David Yandell
Represented By: Nicholas Bennett Waranoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West LLC
Represented By: Thomas K Agawa
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?