Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. v. Seamaster Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.
Defendant: Seamaster Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv05591
Filed: December 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/21/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATION AND ORDER Approving Supersedeas Bond and Issuing Stay. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/06/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (234) Motion to Stay in case 3:10-cv-05591-SC; granting (323) Motion to Stay in case 3:11-cv-02861-SC (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Enforcement-of-Judgment Discovery. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/14/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 199 Defendants Seamaster Logistics, Inc. and Summit Logistics International, Inc.'s Motion for Attorney Fees.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Deadlines. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (196 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , (199 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , (264 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) MOTION for Attorney Fees . Responses due by 4/26/2013. Replies due by 5/10/2013. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/09/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RE: JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 95 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re MOL Audits filed by Toll Global Forwarding (Americas) Inc., Seamaster Logistics, Inc. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 7, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (96 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) (153 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITED PURPOSE PROVIDED FOR BY COURT'S DECEMBER 3, 2012 ORDER RE: IN CAMERA REVIEW OF FMC DOCUMENT (Dkt. Nos. 82 & 84) filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 6, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 COURT TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/5/12. (tdmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER RE: IN CAMERA REVIEW OF FMC DOCUMENT, re: (139 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) Discovery Letter Brief, (84 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 3, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE: DOCKET NOS. 78 & 79 re (78 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC); (130 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) Letter filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd., (79 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC); (131 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) Letter filed by Toll Global Forwarding (Americas) Inc., Seamaster Logistics, Inc. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 14, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER RE JOINT DISCOVERY LETTERS re: (68 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) Joint Discovery Letter Brief, (59 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) Joint Discovery Letter Brief, (64 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief, (69 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) Joint D iscovery Letter Brief, (108 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) Joint Discovery Letter Brief, (119 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) Joint Discovery Letter Brief, (120 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) Joint Discovery Letter Brief, (115 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 8, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTERS re (108 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Toll Global Forwarding (Americas) Inc., Seamaster Logistics, Inc., (107 in 3:11-cv-02861-SC) Letter filed by Mitsui O.S.K. L ines, Ltd., (59 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Toll Global Forwarding (Americas) Inc., Seamaster Logistics, Inc., (60 in 3:10-cv-05591-SC) Letter filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. Discovery Hearing set for 11/8/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 18, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE: PARTIES' HONG KONG DEPOSITIONS (Dkt. No. 48). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/19/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DISCOVERY ORDER re 30 Letter filed by Seamaster Logistics, Inc.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/12/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. v. Seamaster Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Conte C. Cicala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seamaster Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?