Rhynes et al v. Stryker Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Rhynes and Darrell Jenkins
Defendant: Stryker Corporation and Stryker Orthopaedics
Case Number: 3:2010cv05619
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/22/13. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 56 Stipulation.(sclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 53 Ex Parte Application. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER Status Conference set for 5/4/2012 is continued to 7/6/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/1/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 29 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 14 Motion to Dismiss (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/1/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhynes et al v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Rafael A. Campillo
Represented By: Mario Horwitz
Represented By: James Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Orthopaedics
Represented By: Rafael A. Campillo
Represented By: Mario Horwitz
Represented By: James Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Rhynes
Represented By: Jane Louise Trigero
Represented By: Steven R. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Jenkins
Represented By: Jane Louise Trigero
Represented By: Steven R. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?