Almy et al v. United States Department of Defense et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Michael D. Almy, Anthony J. Loverde and Jason D. Knight
Defendant: United States Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates, Department of the Air Force, Michael B. Donley, Department of the Navy and Ray Mabus
Case Number: 3:2010cv05627
Filed: December 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2013 Filing 103 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Michael D. Almy. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/1/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline for Finalizing Settlement filed by Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Andrew Woodmansee, # 2 Proposed Order)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR FINALIZING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 13, 2013 Filing 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline for Finalizing Settlement filed by Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Andrew Woodmansee, # 2 Proposed Order)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 14, 2013 Filing 97 STATUS REPORT Joint by Michael D. Almy. (Gosling, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 17, 2012 Filing 96 STATUS REPORT Joint by Michael D. Almy. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 15, 2012 Filing 95 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Michael D. Almy. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 93 GRANTING TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 11, 2012 Filing 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Andrew Woodmansee, # 2 Proposed Order)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 11, 2012 Filing 92 NOTICE by Michael D. Almy of Withdrawal of E-Filed Document [Docket No. 91] (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 11, 2012 Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Proceedings filed by Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration M Andrew Woodmansee)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 10, 2012 Filing 90 CLERKS NOTICE THE MOTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 15, 2012 WILL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b).(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
September 27, 2012 Filing 89 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING THE MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 88 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 80 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for A Protective Order by Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration M. Andrew Woodmansee, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 87 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/13/2012 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 9/13/2012). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 86 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 85 MOTION to Continue the Hearing Date for Plaintiff Almy's Motion for a Protective Order filed by Department of the Air Force, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 84 CLERKS NOTICE ALL PARTIES SHALL APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 13, 2012 AT 11:00 AM. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 83 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 80 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 6, 2012 Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael D. Almy. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
August 29, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing re 70 Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012) Modified on 8/30/2012 (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 Filing 81 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 80 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order by Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration M. Andrew Woodmansee, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY OF CURRENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO CREATE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 10, 2012 Motion Hearing on 9/27/12 stayed per #79 stipulation and order. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ***FILED IN ERROR PLEASE SEE #80***STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY OF CURRENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO CREATE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012) Modified on 8/24/2012 (cl, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2012 Filing 78 Joint MOTION to Stay Current Briefing Schedule and to Create Briefing Schedule on Motion for Protective Order filed by Michael D. Almy. Responses due by 8/23/2012. Replies due by 8/30/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jessica Roberts)(Roberts, Jessica) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF ALMY'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/3/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 76 Second MOTION to Continue Hearing re Parties' Motions filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
July 13, 2012 Filing 75 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Plaintiffs Jason Knight, Anthony Loverde, and Defendants Department of the Navy and Secretary of the Navy filed by Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF ALMY'S PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/12/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 Filing 73 MOTION to Continue the Hearing Date for Plaintiff Almy's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 6, 2012 Filing 72 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 71 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 7/5/2012) Modified on 7/6/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael D. Almy. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Almy, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Proposed Order)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 68 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/20/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 20, 2012 Filing 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 67 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 Filing 66 CLERKS NOTICE ALL PARTIES SHALL APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Supplemental Case Management Statement and Proposed Order filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 64 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 63 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Supplemental Case Management Statement and Proposed Order filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 62 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE All parties shall appear telephonically at the Case Management Conference scheduled for Febraury 9, 2012. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 59 Case Management Statement Notice of Request of M. Andrew Woodmansee to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Case Management Statement and Proposed Order filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
December 7, 2011 Filing 58 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 57 STIPULATION re 56 Clerks Notice PLAINTIFFS JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 56 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 54 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY BRIEFING ON PARTIES CROSS-MOTIONS AND TO VACATE HEARING DATE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 6, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 49 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING FORTH REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE DEADLINES.Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/2/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 52 STIPULATION (Joint) Setting Forth Revised Briefing Schedule Deadlines by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 51 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/25/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 8/25/2011). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2011)
August 19, 2011 Filing 50 EXHIBITS re 49 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 49 ) (Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 19, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 9/2/2011. Replies due by 9/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 48 Proposed Order re 47 Case Management Statement Joint Case Management Statement by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 4, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING FORTH DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 45 STIPULATION re 38 Amended Complaint, 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 44 Proposed Order re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/10/2011. Replies due by 8/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration by Almy, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Almy Dec, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Almy Dec, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Almy Dec, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Almy Dec, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Almy Dec, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Almy Dec, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Almy Dec, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Almy Dec, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Almy Dec, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Almy Dec, # 12 Declaration by Knight, # 13 Exhibit 1 to Knight Dec, # 14 Exhibit 2 to Knight Dec, # 15 Exhibit 3 to Knight Dec, # 16 Exhibit 4 to Knight Dec, # 17 Exhibit 5 to Knight Dec, # 18 Exhibit 6 to Knight Dec, # 19 Exhibit 7 to Knight Dec, # 20 Declaration by Loverde, # 21 Exhibit 1 to Loverde Dec, # 22 Exhibit 2 to Loverde Dec, # 23 Exhibit 3 to Loverde Dec, # 24 Exhibit 4 to Loverde Dec, # 25 Exhibit 5 to Loverde Dec, # 26 Exhibit 6 to Loverde Dec, # 27 Exhibit 7 to Loverde Dec, # 28 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 7/27/2011) Modified on 8/4/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER Changing the Date of the Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/07/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 41 STIPULATION Setting Forth Deadline for Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Request for Order to Change Date of Initial Case Management Conference by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 23, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by GDB on 6/23/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE 39 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE OF THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS MODIFIED. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 39 Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violations of the United States Constitution and Administrative Procedures Act against Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. Filed byJason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde, Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed byMichael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 35 REPLY (re 30 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ) filed byMichael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 34 REPLY (re 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Court of Federal Claims, Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss Action ) filed byDepartment of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 33 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 32 RESPONSE (re 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Court of Federal Claims, Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss Action ) filed byMichael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 13, 2011 Filing 31 RESPONSE (re 30 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint ) filed byDepartment of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trail Transcript, Witt v. Dep't of the Air Force)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 21, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by GDB on 3/21/11. A futher ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 6/23/11 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 16, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Woodmansee, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Woodmansee - Proposed First Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Woodmansee - Redline, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)(Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 16, 2011 Filing 29 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference continued to 5/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 15, 2011 Filing 28 RESPONSE (re 25 MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference ) filed byMichael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 11, 2011 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 8 Order, Set Hearings Reassignment Order (Roberts, Jessica) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE: 25 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/11.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 10, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 24 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 3/21/11 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Court of Federal Claims, Or, In the Alternative, To Dismiss Action filed by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan B Parker (Parker, Ryan) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 12 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Gerald Freeborne (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 29, 2010 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, on United States Attorney's Office (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, (Woodmansee, Mark) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: 11 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY AARON D. TAX PRO HACE VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: 10 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN M. GOODMAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Aaron D. Tax ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611054198.) filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by John M. Goodman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611054197.) filed by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 9 ERRONEOUS FILING. DOCKETED IN ERROR IN WRONG CASE CLERKS NOTICE - Certified copy of Docket and Certified copy of Remand Order sent to Santa Clara County Superior Court via U.S. Postal Service. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010) Modified on 12/17/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: 7 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/15/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 14, 2010 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Department of the Air Force, Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael D. Almy, Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violations of the States Constitution and Administrative Act against Department of the Navy, Michael B. Donley, Robert M. Gates, Ray Mabus, United States Department of Defense (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611053855). Filed by Jason D. Knight, Anthony J. Loverde, Michael D. Almy. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almy et al v. United States Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Almy
Represented By: Stephanie Lee Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Loverde
Represented By: Stephanie Lee Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason D. Knight
Represented By: Stephanie Lee Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Donley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Mabus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?