Turner v. Graff et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Dawayne Lee Turner
Defendant: Tom Graff, David Brody and Bearer Lee
Case Number: 3:2010cv05709
Filed: December 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Case settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/31/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/27/2013 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 08/15/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 59 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 79 Motion for Summary Judgment (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2012: # 1 Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/6/10 ORDERING that this case is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Graff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dawayne Lee Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bearer Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?