Baker v. Federal Express Corporation
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Baker
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Mediator: John F. Barg
Case Number: 3:2010cv05741
Filed: December 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 38 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off for Limited Purpose. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 27, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/1/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 28 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/30/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 25, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Jane Margaret Flynn
Represented By: Michael E. Gabel
Represented By: Craig Edward Lindberg
Represented By: Christopher James Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: John F. Barg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Baker
Represented By: Shyamala Toke Rajender
Represented By: Waukeen Quandrico McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?