Mediostream Inc. v. Acer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mediostream Inc.
Defendant: Asus Computer International Inc, Apple Inc., Acer America Corporation, Sonic Solutions, Hewlett-Packard Company, Sony Corporation, Acer Inc., Asustek Computer Inc., Dell Inc. and Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv05762
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER 154 FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/4/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/27/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 147 OF DISMISSAL AS TO SONY CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/3/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 143 OF DISMISSAL OF ACER AMERICA CORP. AND ACER, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING MATTER BETWEEN MEDIOSTREAM AND MICROSOFT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/26/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL AND ASUSTEK COMPUTER, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 132 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/27/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY AND DISPOSING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION RE SERVICE ISSUES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/5/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mediostream Inc. v. Acer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asus Computer International Inc
Represented By: Joshua Michael Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Chris L Holm
Represented By: Mark Christopher Scarsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Represented By: Elaine Y. Chow
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Solutions
Represented By: Christina Rose Hollander
Represented By: Matthew Adam Hollander
Represented By: Noel Andrew Leibnitz
Represented By: Roderick Manley Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Ahren Christian Hsu-Hoffman
Represented By: Michael John Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Inc.
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Represented By: Elaine Y. Chow
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asustek Computer Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Michael Masur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Represented By: Joshua Jamison Parker
Represented By: Scott F. Partridge
Represented By: Christopher Scott Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Brian G. Bieluch
Represented By: Roger A. Ford
Represented By: Matthew Kudzin
Represented By: Christina Olson
Represented By: George Frank Pappas
Represented By: Richard L Rainey
Represented By: Gary M. Rubman
Represented By: Scott Schrader
Represented By: Ranganath Sudarshan
Represented By: Ramtin Taheri
Represented By: William Edward Zapf, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mediostream Inc.
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr.
Represented By: Brooke Ashley-May Taylor
Represented By: Stephen D. Susman
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Joseph S. Grinstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: S. Calvin Capshaw
Represented By: Byron W. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?