L&M Ventures LLC et al v. Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America et al
Plaintiff: L&M Ventures LLC, Stuart Lerner and Blue Chip III LLC
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Lipscomb & Pitts Insurance Agency LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 3:2010cv05764
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/24/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER, Motions terminated: 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Further Amendment of Second Pretrial Preparation Order and Continuance of Trial filed by Blue Chip Recycling, LLC, Blue Chip II LLC, Stuart Lerner, Blue Chip II I LLC, L&M Ventures LLC. Jury Selection set for 10/31/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 10/31/2016 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2016 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/13/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER, Motions terminated: 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION RE FURTHER AMENDMENT OF SECOND PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.Extending Discovery Cutoff Deadlines and Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/25/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING 92 Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Time for Expert Witness Disclosures and Expert Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/17/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting Substitution of Attorney 85 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/21/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT 64 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR., Motions terminated: 66 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Blue Chip III LLC, L&M Ventures LLC, Stuart Lerner filed by Stuart Lerner, Blue Chip III LLC, L&M Ventures LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/26/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 49 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER The parties are ORDERED to provide a Joint Status Report to be filed no later than July 15, 2013, indicating what the current status of the Missouri Action is. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/10/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER The parties are ORDERED to provide a Joint Status Report to be filed no later than May23,2013. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/19/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order: The parties are ORDERED to provide a Joint Status Report to be filed no later than April 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/26/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
November 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/12/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. Statement due 6/15/12 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 5/31/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER extending ADR deadline (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L&M Ventures LLC et al v. Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&M Ventures LLC
Represented By: Mark Garry Lerner
Represented By: John Carl Scholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Lerner
Represented By: Mark Garry Lerner
Represented By: John Carl Scholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Chip III LLC
Represented By: Mark Garry Lerner
Represented By: John Carl Scholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By: Melinda W. Ebelhar
Represented By: Edward Chi-Hao Hsu
Represented By: Edward D. Vaisbort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipscomb & Pitts Insurance Agency LLC
Represented By: Ronald D. Echeguren
Represented By: Sanford Goffstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Melinda W. Ebelhar
Represented By: Edward Chi-Hao Hsu
Represented By: Edward D. Vaisbort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?