Craigslist, Inc. v. McGuire Featured Case
Plaintiff: Craigslist, Inc.
Defendant: Thomas G. McGuire
Case Number: 3:2010cv05830
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2011 Filing 22 FINAL JUDGMENT ON CONSENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/5/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 21 Proposed Order Final Judgment on Consent by Craigslist, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to continue CMC re 19 Stipulation filed by Craigslist, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2011. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2011 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/4/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 1, 2011 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference by Craigslist, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/15/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Craigslist, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff craigslist, Inc.'s ADR Certification (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Newman, Richard) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Craigslist, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 16, 2011 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Craigslist, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Craigslist, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER pursuant to 10 Stipulation filed by Craigslist, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/25/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 10 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Produce Defendant Thomas G. McGuire's Emails, Records, and Communications Pursuant to User Consent by Craigslist, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (J. M. McMillan) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 10, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION of Jospeh M. McMillan for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611054862) filed by Craigslist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/10/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Craigslist, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 ***EMC Deadlines terminated. 5 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 22, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Craigslist, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Craig Newmark, Other Affiliate Jim Buckmaster, Other Affiliate eBay Domestic Holdings, Inc. for Craigslist, Inc.. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against Thomas G. McGuire (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611054174). Filed by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 22, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craigslist, Inc. v. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craigslist, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Represented By: Joseph Michael McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas G. McGuire
Represented By: Richard Brian Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?