Tri-Valley Cares v. United States Department of Energy et al
Plaintiff: Tri-Valley Cares
Defendant: United States Department of Energy and National Nuclear Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2010cv05923
Filed: December 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE 38 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 30 TO RESCHEDULE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 17 TO RESCHEDULE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Stipulation filed by Tri-Valley Cares Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/4/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-Valley Cares v. United States Department of Energy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-Valley Cares
Represented By: Scott Justin Yundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Energy
Represented By: Abraham A. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Nuclear Security Administration
Represented By: Abraham A. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?