Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC v. Hotz et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
Defendant: George Hotz
Case Number: 3:2011cv00167
Filed: January 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER release security re 130 Request. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011) Modified on 4/20/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2011 Filing 131 Proposed Order re 130 Statement [RELEASING SECURITY] by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 19, 2011 Filing 130 Statement [REQUEST FOR ORDER RELEASING SECURITY] by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CONSENT JUDGMENT, permanent injunction (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011) Modified on 4/12/2011 (tf, COURT STAFF). (as amended on page 2)
April 11, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF DEFENDANTS HECTOR MARTIN CANTERO, SVEN PETER, AND DOE DEFENDANTS 1-100 WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 127 STIPULATION TO FINAL JUDGMENT UPON CONSENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 5, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 57 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2011 11:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER continuing motion re 124 Stipulation (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011) Modified on 4/6/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2011 Filing 125 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 123 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exhibits F and M to 113 Declaration of Stewart Kellar in Reply to SCEA's Opposition to Defendant Hotz's Motion to Dismiss by George Hotz. (Praetzellis, Jack) (Filed on 4/5/2011) Modified on 4/6/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2011 Filing 124 STIPULATION re 122 Order STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Boroumand Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 116 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RE PROTOCOL FFOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY ON IMPOUNDED DEVICES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/29/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 121 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/28/11, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2011. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 120 Notice of Withdrawal of 101 Motion to Quash (Wrubel, Kenney) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 Filing 119 Proposed Order re 118 Discovery Hearing, [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PROTOCOL FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY ON IMPOUNDED DEVICES by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 118 Minute Entry: TelephonicDiscovery Hearing held on 3/28/2011 before Joseph C. Spero re: Jont Letter Re: Jurisdictional Search of Mr. Hotz's Impounded Hard Drive [docket no. 98] (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 117 REPLY to 103 Opposition (re 57 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE ) DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION BRIEF filed byGeorge Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 3/25/2011) Modified on 3/28/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2011 Filing 116 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits F and M of Declaration of Kellar filed by George Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kellar, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 115 Declaration of George Hotz in Reply of Defendant Hotz to 103 SCEA's Opposition Brief filed byGeorge Hotz. (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 3/25/2011) Modified on 3/28/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2011 Filing 114 Declaration of Alexander Stamos in Reply of Defendant Hotz to 103 SCEA's Opposition Brief filed byGeorge Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 3/25/2011) Modified on 3/28/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2011 Filing 113 Declaration of Stewart Kellar in Reply by Defendant Hotz to 103 SCEA's Opposition Brief filed byGeorge Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit I, # 8 Exhibit J, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L, # 11 Exhibit M)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 3/25/2011) Modified on 3/28/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2011 Filing 112 OBJECTIONS to re 105 Declaration in Opposition, 104 Declaration in Opposition,,, 107 Declaration in Opposition, Objections to Bricker Declaration by George Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 Objections to Law Dec, # 2 Objections to Liu Dec, # 3 Objections to Miller Dec, # 4 Objections to Pierce Dec)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 111 CLERKS NOTICE SETTLING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING. Telephonic Discovery Hearing re: Joint Letter relatd to jurisdictional search of Mr. Hotz's impounded hard drive, docket no. 98, set for 3/28/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 110 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 109 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Exhibits H, L, M, N, P and T to 104 Declaration of Ryan Bricker by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bricker Exs. H, L, M, N, P and T_Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Bricker Exs. H, L, M, N, P and T_Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Bricker Exs. H, L, M, N, P and T_Part 4, # 4 Exhibit Bricker Exs. H, L, M, N, P and T_Part 5, # 5 Exhibit Bricker Exs. H, L, M, N, P and T_Part 6, # 6 Exhibit Bricker Exs. H, L, M, N, P and T_Part 7, # 7 Exhibit Bricker Exs. H, L, M, N, P and T_Part 8, # 8 Exhibit Law Exs. A and B, # 9 Exhibit Pierce Ex. A)(Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/23/2011) Modified on 3/24/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2011 Remark : Counsel is reminded to e.file the sealed documents. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 19, 2011 Filing 108 Exhibit A to 107 Miller Declaration filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A pt. 2, # 2 Exhibit A pt. 3, # 3 Exhibit A pt. 4)(Related document(s) 107 ) (Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/19/2011) Modified on 3/21/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2011 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Marvin Miller in Support of 103 Opposition/Response to Motion filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B to Miller Declaration, # 2 Exhibit C to Miller Declaration)(Related document(s) 103 ) (Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/19/2011) Modified on 3/21/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2011 Filing 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Gaudreau Declaration ISO Admin Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/19/2011)
March 19, 2011 Filing 105 DECLARATION in Support of 103 Opposition/Response to Motion filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Liu Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Pierce, # 3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 103 ) (Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/19/2011) Modified on 3/21/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2011 Filing 104 DECLARATION of Ryan Bricker in Sopport of 103 Opposition/Response to Motion filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Bricker Decl., # 2 Exhibit B to Bricker Decl, # 3 Exhibit C to Bricker Decl, # 4 Exhibit D to Bricker Decl, # 5 Exhibit E to Bricker Decl, # 6 Exhibit F to Bricker Decl, # 7 Exhibit G to Bricker Decl, # 8 Exhibit H to Bricker Decl, # 9 Exhibit I to Bricker Decl, # 10 Exhibit J to Bricker Decl, # 11 Exhibit K to Bricker Decl, # 12 Exhibit L to Bricker Decl, # 13 Exhibit M to Bricker Decl, # 14 Exhibit N to Bricker Decl, # 15 Exhibit O to Bricker Decl, # 16 Exhibit P to Bricker Decl, # 17 Exhibit Q to Bricker Decl, # 18 Exhibit R to Bricker Decl, # 19 Exhibit S to Bricker Decl, # 20 Exhibit T to Bricker Decl, # 21 Exhibit U to Bricker Decl)(Related document(s) 103 ) (Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/18/2011) Modified on 3/21/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2011 Filing 103 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to (re 57 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE ) filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/18/2011) Modified on 3/21/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 3/18/11,denying 100 George Hotz's Motion for Protective Order (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 101 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by SoftLayer. (Wrubel, Kenney) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 100 MOTION for Protective Order filed by George Hotz. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 99 EXHIBITS re 98 Letter, Exhibit 10 Re Delayed Filing filed byGeorge Hotz. (Related document(s) 98 ) (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 16, 2011 Filing 98 Letter from [Joint] Defendant George Hotz and Plaintiff SCEA re [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PROTOCOL FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re SDK and PSN ON IMPOUNDED DEVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5-9)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 95 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE MARCH 10, 2011 TELEPHONIC HEARING RE JONT LETTER ON IMPOUNDMENT ISSUES AND JOINT LETTER ON DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/15/11. **Please note change on page 3, line 12**(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Yasha Heidari ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611057493.) filed by George Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 94 Letter from [Joint] Plaintiff SCEA and Defendant George Hotz re Proposed Order for March 10, 2011 Hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit A)(Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 10, 2011 Filing 93 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/10/2011, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2011. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 10, 2011 Filing 92 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 3/10/2011 before Joseph C. Spero. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 91 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING. Telephonic Discovery Hearing re: Joint Letter on Impoundment Issues [docket no. 86] set for 3/10/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re 88 Letter on Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/3/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE by George Hotz of Association of Counsel (Praetzellis, Jack) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 88 Letter from Plaintiff Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC Re Third Party Jurisdictional Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E to Letter to Judge Joseph Spero)(Gilliland, James) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re: preliminary injunction (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 86 Letter from James G. Gilliland and Stewart Kellar [Joint] Re: Impoundment Issues. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 22, 2011 MOTION to Expedite MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY vacated off of Judge Illston's calendar - motion referred to Spero (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 85 Letter from James G. Gilliland and Stewart Kellar [Joint] Re: Discovery Issues. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 57 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ENTERING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND CONTINUING MOTION. re 83 Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011) Modified on 2/22/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2011 Filing 83 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ODER RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Preliminary Injunction and Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 82 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2011 before Illston (Date Filed: 2/15/2011). (Court Reporter K. Wyatt.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/15/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 81 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Parties shall m eet and confer regarding the language of the injunction. If the parties are unable to agree on the language, a Joint Letter stating each side's position shall be submitted no later than 2/16/2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/14/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/14/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; REFERRING PARTIES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO FOR DISCOVERY AND ISSUES RELATED TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 78 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 76 Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exhibit B to 73 Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion Re: TRO by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 2/11/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2011 Filing 77 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 10, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2011. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 74 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 75 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2011 before Illston (Date Filed: 2/10/2011). This case shall be referred to Magistrate-Judge Spero for purposes of discovery and to define terms of the injunction.(Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 74 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF HOLLY GAUDREAU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION RE: TRO filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit B to Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion Re: TRO, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit B to Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion Re TRO)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 73 Declaration of HOLLY GAUDREAU in Support of 72 Memorandum in Opposition TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION RE: TRO filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion Re TRO, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion Re TRO, # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion Re TRO)(Related document(s) 72 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 72 Memorandum in Opposition TO 66 DEFENDANT'S MOTION RE: TRO filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 2/9/2011) Modified on 2/10/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2011 Filing 71 CORRECTED ENTRY: CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 66 MOTION for Hearing re 50 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION FOR HEARING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER MOTION for Hearing re 50 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION FOR HEARING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2011 10:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 70 CLERKS NOTICE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 66 MOTION for Hearing re 50 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION FOR HEARING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER MOTION for Hearing re 50 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION FOR HEARING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Shorten Time (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 68 CLERKS NOTICE YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT counsel must not notice any motion prior to the what the Civil Local Rules require. All motions must be properly noticed. If counsel wish to have the hearing date heard on shorten time they must obtain an order allowing shorten notice. Counsel have continued to notice the motions improperly as if the motion for shorten time was granted already. This is improper and Counsel is instructed to stop immediately. This practice is causing matters to appear on the calendar improperly and causes confusion to the Courts staff and counsel.Any order filed granting the request will automatically adjust the properly noticed hearing date. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING MOTION FOR HEARING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by George Hotz. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Stewart Kellar, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 66 MOTION for Hearing re 50 Order on Motion for TRO MOTION FOR HEARING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by George Hotz. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 61 Motion to Shorten Time (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 7, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 62 MOTION to Expedite MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER setting motion to dismiss and motion for preliminary injunction on 3/11/11. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to March 11, 2011 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 63 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing March 11, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 62 MOTION to Expedite MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, # 2 Exhibit A to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 3 Exhibit B to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 4 Exhibit C to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 5 Exhibit D to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 6 Exhibit E to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 7 Exhibit F to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 8 Exhibit G to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 9 Exhibit H to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 10 Exhibit I to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 11 Exhibit J to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 12 Exhibit K to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 13 Exhibit L to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 14 Exhibit M to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 15 Exhibit N to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 16 Exhibit O to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 17 Exhibit P to Decl of Holly Gaudreau, # 18 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Expedited Discovery)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 61 MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing Motion on Expedited Discovery filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Holly Gaudreau, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 60 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by George Hotz WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by George Hotz re 57 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE, 58 Declaration in Support, (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 58 Declaration of Stewart Kellar in Support of 57 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE , Second Declaration of Stewart Kellar filed byGeorge Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 57 ) (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by George Hotz. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 1, 2011 Filing 56 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE: SCHEDULING PERSONAL JURISDICTION BRIEFING AND HEARING; PARTIES' STATEMENTS RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BRIEFING AND HEARING by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by George Hotz. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Motion for Reconsideration)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2011 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 54 SECURITY by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 50 Order granting 2 Motion for TRO (Attachments: # 1 RECEIPT)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 52 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 49 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exhibits to 42 Declaration of Ryan Bricker in support of 2 Motions by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Exhibit M, # 5 Exhibit N, # 6 Exhibit O)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/27/2011) Modified on 1/28/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting TRO (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 2 Motion for TRO (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 40 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 41 Motion to REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 47 Reply to Opposition to Defendant George Hotz's Supplemental Brief on Personal Jurisdiction filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 23, 2011 Filing 46 Supplemental Brief in Opposition to 2 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion For Temporary Restraining Order filed byGeorge Hotz. (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 1/23/2011) Modified on 1/24/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2011 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Yasha Heidari in Opposition to 2 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion For Temporary Restraining Order filed byGeorge Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 1/23/2011) Modified on 1/24/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2011 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of George Hotz in Opposition to 2 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion For Temporary Restraining Order filed byGeorge Hotz. (Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 1/23/2011) Modified on 1/24/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2011 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC OF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 32 (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 20, 2011 Filing 42 Declaration of Ryan Bricker in Support of 2 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Order of Impoundment filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD)(Related document(s) 28 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/20/2011) Modified on 1/20/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Number 28 Declaration filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Holly Gaudreau in Support of Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/20/2011) Modified on 1/20/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2011 Filing 40 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits I, J, K, L, M, N, and O to the Declaration of Ryan Bricker in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction; Order of Impoundment filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits I, J, K, L, M, N and O, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. George Hotz served on 1/12/2011, answer due 2/2/2011. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 38 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 30 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exs. B and D to 28 Supp. Ryan Bricker Declaration by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Filing 37 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 34 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exs. T and X to 28 Ryan Bricker Declaration by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit X)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Filing 36 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 24 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Exhibits D, G, U, V, Y and CC to 28 Declaration of Ryan Bricker by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit U, # 3 Exhibit V, # 4 Exhibit Y, # 5 Exhibit CC)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 26 Motion to remove incurrectly filed documents (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 25 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 33 Minute Entry: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 1/14/2011 before Illston (Date Filed: 1/18/2011). (Court Reporter K. Sullivan.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2011)
January 17, 2011 Filing 32 Supplemental Brief in support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gilliland, James) (Filed on 1/17/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2011 Filing 31 Declaration of James G. Gilliland, Jr. in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 2 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 20 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 29 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 14, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2011. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 13, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 28 *** EXHIBIT I,J,K,L,M,O, and P FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Declaration of Ryan Bricker in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD)(Related document(s) 2 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/13/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2011 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Stewart Kellar in support of 19 Opposition to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion For Temporary Restraining Order filed byGeorge Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 1/13/2011) Modified on 1/14/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly File Documents filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Incorrectly File Documents)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/13/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2011 Filing 25 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits T and X to the Ryan Bricker Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Holly Gaudreau In Support of Administrative Motion, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing for 2 motion for temporary restraining order set for 1/14/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011) Modified on 1/14/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2011 Filing 22 Declaration of Ryan Bricker in Support of 4 Declaration in Support, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 21 Declaration in Support,, SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RYAN BRICKER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 4 , 2 , 21 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 21 Declaration of Ryan Bricker in Support of 20 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits B and D to Supplemental Declaration of Ryan Bricker Regarding Defendant Hotz and Third Parties' Activity After Receiving Notice of Lawsuit in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Tem, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 20 , 2 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 20 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits B and D to Supplemental Declaration of Ryan Bricker Regarding Defendant Hotz and Third Parties' Activity After Receiving Notice of Lawsuit in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Holly Gaudreau, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition To Ex Parte Motion For Temporary Restraining Order, Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, And Order Of Impoundment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition filed byGeorge Hotz. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF GEORGE HOTZ)(Kellar, Stewart) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 18 Declaration of BRET MOGILEFSKY in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 2 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE re Motion to Relate Cases: The Court has reviewed the motion and has determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 11, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (cmc statement due date and cmc date) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT [DECLARATION OF RYAN BRICKER OF PROVIDING ACTUAL NOTICE OF FILING EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT TO DEFENDANT GEORGE HOTZ] by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Bricker Declaration)(Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 14 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/11/11. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 11 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 10 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Hector Martin Cantero, George Hotz, Sven Peter. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Manual Filing Notification by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 6 Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of 5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 5 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits D, G, U, V, W, Y, and CC to Declaration of Ryan Bricker in support of 2 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 4 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT REMOVED PER ORDER # 35 . *** Declaration of Ryan Bricker in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 2 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011) (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/12/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2011: # 1 Order granting Removal of Document) (ys, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/19/2011) (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/19/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 Filing 3 Declaration of Riley R. Russell in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 2 ) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, and Order of Impoundment; Memorandum and Authorities in Support filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Hector Martin Cantero, George Hotz, Sven Peter (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611054944). Filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC v. Hotz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
Represented By: Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith
Represented By: Ryan T. Bricker
Represented By: Timothy R. Cahn
Represented By: Holly Gaudreau
Represented By: James G. Gilliland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Hotz
Represented By: Yasha Heidari
Represented By: Stewart Reynolds Kellar
Represented By: Jack Conrad-Charles Praetzellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?