IN RE Arden Van Upp
Trustee: David A. Bradlow and U.S. Trustee
Miscellaneous: San Francisco Bankruptcy Court and Thomas E. Carlson
Case Number: 3:2011cv00178
Filed: January 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATIONS FOR TIME TO FILE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; AND GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANT'S BRIEF (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE Arden Van Upp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: David A. Bradlow
Represented By: Michael D. Cooper
Represented By: Elizabeth Berke-Dreyfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Minnie Loo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: San Francisco Bankruptcy Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Thomas E. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?