Jenkins et al v. Mandelbaum et al
Plaintiff: Stephan Jenkins, Third Eye Blind Inc, 3EB Touring Inc and Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc
Defendant: Thomas Irving Mandelbaum, Selverne Mandelbaum & Mintz LLP and Hiscock & Barclay LLP
Case Number: 3:2011cv00211
Filed: January 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION filed by 3EB Touring Inc, Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc, Hiscock & Barclay LLP, Third Eye Blind Inc, Stephan Jenkins. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying request defendant's request to excuse East Coast representatives from attending the July 16, 2013 settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/10/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS THOMAS IRVING MANDELBAUM AND SELVERNE, MANDELBAUM & MINTZ, LLP filed by 3EB Touring Inc, Thomas Irving Mandelbaum, Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc, Hiscock & Barclay LLP, Third Eye Blind Inc, Selverne Mandelbaum & Mintz LLP, Stephan Jenkins. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ALLOWING SANJIT SHAH TO APPEAR BY PHONE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXCUSE EAST COAST REPRESENTATIVES FROM PERSONALLY ATTENDING JANUARY 8, 2013 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 77 Declaration of Robert A. Barrer, 78 Declaration of William H. Jeberg filed by Hiscock & Barclay LLP. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE filed by 3EB Touring Inc, Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc, Third Eye Blind Inc, Stephan Jenkins Status Report due by 1/10/2013. Status Conference set for 1/17/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER ADVANCING STATUS FOR BOTH C11-0211 EMC and C11-3232 EMC cases re (119 in 3:11-cv-03232-EMC) Joint MOTION Advance Status Conferences (Hiscock Firm, Thomas Mandelbaum. Rawson Defendants, As Well As) filed by 3EB Tou ring, Inc., Stephen Jenkins Productions, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Third Eye Blind, Inc., Stephan Jenkins, Bradley Hargreaves, (54 in 3:11-cv-00211-EMC) Joint MOTION Administrative Relief to Advance Status Conferences in Jenkins v. M andelbaum and Fredianelli v. Jenkins; and Proposed Order filed by 3EB Touring Inc, Thomas Irving Mandelbaum, Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc, Hiscock & Barclay LLP, Third Eye Blind Inc, Selverne Mandelbaum & Mintz LLP, Stephan Jenkins Status Report due by 2/10/2012. Status Conference set for 2/17/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (104 in 3:11-cv-03232-EMC) Stipulation, filed by 3EB Touring, Inc., Stephen Jenkins Productions, Inc., Third Eye Blind, Inc., Stephan Jenkins, Bradley Hargreaves. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING DMC re 48 Stipulation filed by 3EB Touring Inc, Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc, Third Eye Blind Inc, Stephan Jenkins Status Report due by 3/2/2012. Status Conference set for 3/9/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/31/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING STATUS re 45 Stipulation filed by 3EB Touring Inc, Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc, Third Eye Blind Inc, Stephan Jenkins Replies due by 8/24/2011. Status Conference set for 11/7/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Judge Edward M. Chen's FINAL STANDING ORDER (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 35 Stipulation, filed by 3EB Touring Inc, Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc, Third Eye Blind Inc, Stephan Jenkins. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/25/11. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 35 Stipulation, filed by 3EB Touring Inc, Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc, Third Eye Blind Inc, Stephan Jenkins. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 18 Stipulation, filed by 3EB Touring Inc, Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc, Third Eye Blind Inc, Stephan Jenkins. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins et al v. Mandelbaum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Jenkins
Represented By: Ory Sandel
Represented By: Richard J. Idell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Third Eye Blind Inc
Represented By: Ory Sandel
Represented By: Richard J. Idell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3EB Touring Inc
Represented By: Ory Sandel
Represented By: Richard J. Idell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Jenkins Productions Inc
Represented By: Richard J. Idell
Represented By: Ory Sandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Irving Mandelbaum
Represented By: Kenneth M. Labbate
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Represented By: David A. Nelson
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Represented By: Joseph Marion Rimac
Represented By: Sanjit Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selverne Mandelbaum & Mintz LLP
Represented By: Kenneth M. Labbate
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Represented By: David A. Nelson
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Represented By: Joseph Marion Rimac
Represented By: Sanjit Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscock & Barclay LLP
Represented By: John Paul Girarde
Represented By: James Anthony Murphy
Represented By: Bryan Leland Patrick Saalfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?